Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/01/2019 at 05:18:47 (UTC).

Christianne Menjivar Barahona

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 Christianne Menjivar Barahona was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott H. Yun. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-11596

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Scott H. Yun

 

Party Details

Debtor

Christianne Menjivar Barahona

Riverside, CA 92503

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Trustee

Steven M Speier (TR)

Newport Beach, CA 92658

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Bryn C Deb

Attorney at A2B Legal

1855 W Katella Ave Ste 245

Orange, CA 92867

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/02/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 06/03/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 06/03/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#12

(#12) Original Holographic signature page Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#11

(#11) Original Holographic signature page Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#10

(#10) Original Holographic signature page Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor(s) Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#9

(#9) Original Holographic signature page Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#8

(#8) Original Holographic signature page Statement of Financial Affairs for Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#7

(#7) Original Holographic signature page Declaration About an individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#6

(#6) Original Holographic signature page Statement of Related Cases Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#5

(#5) Addendum to voluntary petition Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#4

(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Christianne Menjivar Barahona (Deb, Bryn) WARNING: See docket entrie no. 14 for corrective entry. Modified on 2/28/2019 (Denson, Latisha). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without electronic /s/ or holographic signature. THE FILER HAS RE-FILED THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES IN DOCKET ENTRIES NO. 5-12. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona) (Denson, Latisha) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/02/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 103, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 06/03/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 06/03/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Original Holographic signature page Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Original Holographic signature page Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Original Holographic signature page Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor(s) Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Original Holographic signature page Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Original Holographic signature page Statement of Financial Affairs for Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Original Holographic signature page Declaration About an individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Original Holographic signature page Statement of Related Cases Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Addendum to voluntary petition Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:19-bk-11596) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 48603518. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Christianne Menjivar Barahona. (Deb, Bryn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Christianne Menjivar Barahona (Deb, Bryn) WARNING: See docket entrie no. 14 for corrective entry. Modified on 2/28/2019 (Denson, Latisha). (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryn C Deb