This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2019 at 05:17:45 (UTC).

Charles W Friend, Jr

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Charles W Friend, Jr in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-19020

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Charles W Friend, Jr

Trustee

Rod Danielson (TR)

US Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

 

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/04/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $310.00 by 14. Receipt Number 60147780. (admin) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Charles W Friend Jr . (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/04/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2019. (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Charles W Friend Jr Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/29/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/29/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/29/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/29/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/29/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/29/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/29/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/29/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/29/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/29/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 10/29/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 10/29/2019. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 10/29/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 10/29/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/29/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 10/29/2019. (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.