This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/26/2022 at 06:33:54 (UTC).

Champey Pain Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Champey Pain Group, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Erik P. Kimball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-BK-11579

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Erik P. Kimball

 

Party Details

Debtor

Champey Pain Group, LLC

195 Us 46, Suite 201

Mine Hill, NJ 07803

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Trustees

Tarek Kirk Kiem

Greenacres, FL 33454

Carol Lynn Fox

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Joshua Lanphear

Attorney at Shraiberg Page, P.A.

2385 Nw Executive Center Dr., #300

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Bradley S Shraiberg

2385 Nw Executive Center Dr. #300

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Us Trustee Attorney

Heidi A Feinman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor by Attorney Bradley S Shraiberg. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#40

(#40) Certificate of Service by Attorney Bradley S Shraiberg (Re: #33 Amended Meeting of Creditors 11, #39 Schedules and Statements Filed filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC). (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

39 #2

Local Form 4

39 #1

Main Document

#38

(#38) Certificate of Service by Attorney Bradley S Shraiberg (Re: #37 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information). (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#37

(#37) Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information. Deadline Extended through 3/25/2022. (Re: #35) [Incomplete Filings due by 3/25/2022]. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 3/25/2022. Schedule A/B due 3/25/2022. Schedule D due 3/25/2022. Schedule E/F due 3/25/2022. Schedule G due 3/25/2022. Schedule H due 3/25/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/25/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/25/2022. (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#36

(#36) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #33 Amended Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/1/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/31/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 5/6/2022. (Amended to reflect successor trustee)) Notice Date 03/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#35

(#35) Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, and Statements Filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC (Lanphear, Joshua) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#33

(#33) Amended Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/1/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/31/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 5/6/2022. (Amended to reflect successor trustee) (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Robert C Furr Esq Filed by Creditor Echelon Financial, LLC. (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

7 #2

Verified Statement

7 #1

Main Document

#6

(#6) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 3/7/2022].Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 3/7/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 3/11/2022. Schedule A/B due 3/11/2022. Schedule D due 3/11/2022. Schedule E/F due 3/11/2022. Schedule G due 3/11/2022. Schedule H due 3/11/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/11/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/11/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 3/11/2022]. (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing Certificate of Limited Liability Company Resolution, Filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#3

(#3) Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Appointment of Health Care Ombudsman due by 03/28/2022 Proofs of Claim due by 05/6/2022. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor by Attorney Bradley S Shraiberg. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Certificate of Service by Attorney Bradley S Shraiberg (Re: #33 Amended Meeting of Creditors 11, #39 Schedules and Statements Filed filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC). (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Schedules and Statements Filed(22-11579-EPK) [misc,schsia] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40659571. Fee amount 32.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] List of Creditors who have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and are Not Insiders [Fee Amount $32] Filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Local Form 4) (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Certificate of Service by Attorney Bradley S Shraiberg (Re: #37 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information). (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information. Deadline Extended through 3/25/2022. (Re: #35) [Incomplete Filings due by 3/25/2022]. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 3/25/2022. Schedule A/B due 3/25/2022. Schedule D due 3/25/2022. Schedule E/F due 3/25/2022. Schedule G due 3/25/2022. Schedule H due 3/25/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/25/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/25/2022. (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #33 Amended Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/1/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/31/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 5/6/2022. (Amended to reflect successor trustee)) Notice Date 03/13/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, and Statements Filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC (Lanphear, Joshua) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Certificate of Service by Attorney Joshua Lanphear (Re: #28 Order on Motion to Extend Time). (Lanphear, Joshua) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Amended Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 4/1/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/31/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 5/6/2022. (Amended to reflect successor trustee) (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Marc P Barmat Filed by Creditor Echelon Financial, LLC. (Barmat, Marc) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Robert C Furr Esq Filed by Creditor Echelon Financial, LLC. (Furr, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice Appointing Tarek Kirk Kiem as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement)(Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 3/7/2022].Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 3/7/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 3/11/2022. Schedule A/B due 3/11/2022. Schedule D due 3/11/2022. Schedule E/F due 3/11/2022. Schedule G due 3/11/2022. Schedule H due 3/11/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 3/11/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 3/11/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 3/11/2022]. (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Eisenberg, Randy) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing Certificate of Limited Liability Company Resolution, Filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(22-11579) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40534738. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Champey Pain Group, LLC. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Appointment of Health Care Ombudsman due by 03/28/2022 Proofs of Claim due by 05/6/2022. (Shraiberg, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAMPEY PAIN GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heidi Ann Feinman(Designation Retained)