This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/21/2022 at 06:31:02 (UTC).

CGM & Daughters Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 CGM Daughters Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New Jersey Bankruptcy . The Judge overseeing this case is Stacey L. Meisel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-BK-10481

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Stacey L. Meisel

 

Party Details

Debtor

CGM & Daughters Corporation

39 Graydon Terrace

Clifton, NJ 07013

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

One Newark Center Ste 2100

Newark, NJ 07102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Adrian J Johnson

Attorney at JOHNSON & ASSOCIATES, PC

485C Us Highway 1 South, Suite 100

Iselin, NJ 08830

Us Trustee Attorney

Fran B. Steele

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

One Newark Center, Suite 2100

Newark, NJ 07102-5504

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Certificate of Service (related document:#27 Opposition filed by Creditor Mario Jimenez) filed by Nicholas Fitzgerald on behalf of Mario Jimenez. (Fitzgerald, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#27

(#27) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Dismissal of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case in Opposition to (related document:#26 Motion to Vacate Dismissal of Case Filed by Adrian J Johnson on behalf of CGM & Daughters Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 3/29/2022 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary # 3 Proposed Order # 4 Certificate of Service) filed by Debtor CGM & Daughters Corporation) filed by Nicholas Fitzgerald on behalf of Mario Jimenez. (Fitzgerald, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

26 #5

Certificate of Service

26 #4

Proposed Order

26 #3

Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary

26 #2

Certification

26 #1

Main Document

23 #5

Proposed Order

23 #3

Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Scott S. Rever on behalf of AGSCO Corporation. (Rever, Scott) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/27/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#7

Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Case is dismissed. (related document(s): #7 Notice of Hearing -(No Upload)) (LVJ) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Steele, Fran) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#5

(#5) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/23/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#4

(#4) BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 01/23/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/2/2022 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 3/31/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/19/2022. (mlc) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: List of Equity Security Holders, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/20/2022. Hearing scheduled for 2/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (smz) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#1

(#7) Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Adrian J Johnson on behalf of CGM & Daughters Corporation. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 07/19/2022. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 11/16/2022. filed by Debtor CGM & Daughters Corporation). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2022 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (LVJ) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Case is dismissed. (related document(s): #7 Notice of Hearing -(No Upload)) (LVJ) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Certificate of Service (related document:#27 Opposition filed by Creditor Mario Jimenez) filed by Nicholas Fitzgerald on behalf of Mario Jimenez. (Fitzgerald, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Dismissal of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case in Opposition to (related document:#26 Motion to Vacate Dismissal of Case Filed by Adrian J Johnson on behalf of CGM & Daughters Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 3/29/2022 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary # 3 Proposed Order # 4 Certificate of Service) filed by Debtor CGM & Daughters Corporation) filed by Nicholas Fitzgerald on behalf of Mario Jimenez. (Fitzgerald, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Motion to Vacate Dismissal of Case Filed by Adrian J Johnson on behalf of CGM & Daughters Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 3/29/2022 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary #3 Proposed Order #4 Certificate of Service) (Johnson, Adrian) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Withdrawn. (related document:#23 Motion re: Motion to Reinstate Case Filed by Adrian J Johnson on behalf of CGM & Daughters Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2022 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (LVJ) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrection Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#23 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor CGM & Daughters Corporation). Type of Error: Incorrect Event Code. Please refile Motion using correct event code to vacate dismissal and using Court's forms on Motions to Vacate Dismissal. (LVJ) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Certificate of Service (related document:#24 Opposition filed by Creditor Mario Jimenez) filed by Nicholas Fitzgerald on behalf of Mario Jimenez. (Fitzgerald, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to (related document:#23 Motion re: Motion to Reinstate Case Filed by Adrian J Johnson on behalf of CGM & Daughters Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2022 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor CGM & Daughters Corporation) filed by Nicholas Fitzgerald on behalf of Mario Jimenez. (Fitzgerald, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Scheduled for 3/1/2022 is Withdrawn. Case Dismissed on 2/15/2022 (related document(s): #13 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Fanny Alvarado) (ntp) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Scheduled for 3/1/2022 is Withdrawn. Case Dismissed on 2/15/2022 (related document(s): #11 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Mario Jimenez) (ntp) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Scott S. Rever on behalf of AGSCO Corporation. (Rever, Scott) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/27/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Adrian J Johnson on behalf of CGM & Daughters Corporation. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 07/19/2022. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 11/16/2022. filed by Debtor CGM & Daughters Corporation). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2022 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (LVJ) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Steele, Fran) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/23/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 01/23/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/2/2022 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 3/31/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/19/2022. (mlc) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: List of Equity Security Holders, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/20/2022. Hearing scheduled for 2/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (smz) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-10481) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43422211, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Adrian J Johnson on behalf of CGM & Daughters Corporation. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 07/19/2022. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 11/16/2022. (Johnson, Adrian) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fran B. Steele