This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2021 at 06:31:00 (UTC).

CG Financial Chile SpA

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 CG Financial Chile SpA was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is J Kate Stickles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-10976

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

J Kate Stickles

 

Party Details

Debtor

CG Financial Chile SpA

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court

Prime Clerk LLC

One Grand Central Place

60 East 42Nd St, SUIT 1440

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Pauline K. Morgan

Attorney at Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Elizabeth Soper Justison

Attorney at Young Conaway

1000 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

4 #2

Statement of Financial Affairs

4 #1

Main Document

#2

(#2) Order Directing Joint Administration Of Chapter 11 Cases An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case withthe case of Corp Group Banking S.A. (Case No. 21-10969 (JKS))for procedural purposes only and providing for its jointadministration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket inCase No. 21-10969 (JKS) should be consulted for all mattersaffecting this case. Signed on 7/2/2021 (AJL) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by CG Financial Chile SpA. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by CG Financial Chile SpA. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Financial Affairs) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-10976) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10392366, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Directing Joint Administration Of Chapter 11 Cases An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case withthe case of Corp Group Banking S.A. (Case No. 21-10969 (JKS))for procedural purposes only and providing for its jointadministration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket inCase No. 21-10969 (JKS) should be consulted for all mattersaffecting this case. Signed on 7/2/2021 (AJL) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketJudge J Kate Stickles added to case (LB) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by CG Financial Chile SpA. (Morgan, Pauline) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prime Clerk LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Soper Justison

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pauline K. Morgan