This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2021 at 05:08:05 (UTC).

Catherine Muhlenforth

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Catherine Muhlenforth was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen Tighe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11699

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

Judge Details

Judge

Maureen Tighe

 

Party Details

Debtor

Catherine Muhlenforth

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Trustee

Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR)

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Gregory M Shanfeld

Attorney at Wadhwani & Shanfeld, a Prof Law Corp

15233 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1000

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/1/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 1/25/2022 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. Proofs of Claims due by 12/27/2021. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(# 1:21-bk-11699) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A53505678. Fee amount 313.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Catherine Muhlenforth. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Catherine Muhlenforth. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Catherine Muhlenforth. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Catherine Muhlenforth. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Catherine Muhlenforth. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Catherine Muhlenforth (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M Shanfeld