This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/25/2023 at 06:31:06 (UTC).

Soco West, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2023 Soco West, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New Jersey Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael B. Kaplan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-BK-13578

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Michael B. Kaplan

 

Party Details

Debtor

Soco West, Inc.

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Michael D. Sirota

Us Trustee Attorneys

Lauren Bielskie

Jeffrey M. Sponder

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Soco West, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/24/2023. (Sirota, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jeffrey M. Sponder on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Sponder, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#4

(#4) Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 23-13575; 23-13576; 23-13578; 23-13581 Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Soco West, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#5

(#5) CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Soco West, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/24/2023. filed by Debtor Soco West, Inc.). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/6/2023 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/29/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/30/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Bielskie on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bielskie, Lauren) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

#8

(#8) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 23-13575 Member Cases: 23-13576, 23-13578 and 23-13581 (Related Doc #4). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/8/2023. (wiq) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

#9

(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Hinds, James) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jeffrey W. Herrmann on behalf of Orange County Water District. (Herrmann, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

#12

(#12) Hearing Rescheduled from 6/6/2023 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (related document:#5 CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Soco West, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/24/2023. filed by Debtor Soco West, Inc.). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/6/2023 at 11:30 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

#13

(#13) BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/02/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/03/2023)

 

Docket Entries

06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinute of 6/6/23; OUTCOME: Held and Discontinued (related document(s): #5 Notice of Hearing (Upload)) (km) (Entered: 06/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/02/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Hearing Rescheduled from 6/6/2023 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (related document:#5 CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Soco West, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/24/2023. filed by Debtor Soco West, Inc.). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/6/2023 at 11:30 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jeffrey W. Herrmann on behalf of Orange County Water District. (Herrmann, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Hinds, James) (Entered: 05/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 23-13575 Member Cases: 23-13576, 23-13578 and 23-13581 (Related Doc #4). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/8/2023. (wiq) (Entered: 05/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Bielskie on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bielskie, Lauren) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/29/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Soco West, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/24/2023. filed by Debtor Soco West, Inc.). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/6/2023 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wiq) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 23-13575; 23-13576; 23-13578; 23-13581 Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Soco West, Inc.. (Sirota, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jeffrey M. Sponder on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Sponder, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketRemark: Case related to 23-13575, 23-13576 and 23-13581. (mrg) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketReceipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 23-13578) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45238674, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

Docket(#2) Case Assignment. Judge Michael B. Kaplan added to the case. (nrf) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Soco West, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/24/2023. (Sirota, Michael) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less