This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/08/2023 at 06:10:54 (UTC).

IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Co v. Sage et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2023 IRVING H PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Co filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Sage. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecelia G. Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-AP-01099

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Cecelia G. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff

Defendants

Malcolm Sage

Lynne Florio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seanna Brown

Lan Hoang

David J. Sheehan

Nicholas Cremona

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas J. Fleming

Jonathan T. Koevary

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) Certificate of Service for the Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s)#33, #32) Filed by Lan Hoang on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hoang, Lan) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

33 #7

Exhibit 6

33 #6

Exhibit 5

33 #5

Exhibit 4

33 #4

Exhibit 3

33 #3

Exhibit 2

33 #2

Exhibit 1

33 #1

Main Document

#32

(#32) Opposition /Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s)#26) filed by Lan Hoang on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hoang, Lan) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

#5

(#8) Amended Motion to Extend Time (Amended Notice of Motion of Defendants to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) (related document(s)#5) filed by Jonathan T. Koevary on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage with hearing to be held on 6/21/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (CGM - NYC). (Koevary, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service to Malcolm Sage (related document(s)#1, #2) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#3

(#3) Affidavit of Service to Lynne Florio (related document(s)#1, #2) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

#2

(#4) Affidavit of Service to Malcolm Sage (related document(s)#1, #2) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Certificate of Service for the Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s)#33, #32) Filed by Lan Hoang on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hoang, Lan) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Declaration of Lan Hoang in Support of Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s)#26) filed by Lan Hoang on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 #6 Exhibit 6) (Hoang, Lan) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Opposition /Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s)#26) filed by Lan Hoang on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hoang, Lan) (Entered: 08/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Thomas J. Fleming on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage. (Fleming, Thomas) (Entered: 07/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Notice of Appearance filed by Lan Hoang on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hoang, Lan) (Entered: 07/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#26) Filed by Jonathan T. Koevary on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage. (Koevary, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • Docket(#28) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Pre Trial Conference; hearing not held and adjourned to 09/20/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Tara Turner on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Turner, Tara) (Entered: 07/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support) (related document(s)#1) filed by Jonathan T. Koevary on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage. with hearing to be held on 9/20/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (CGM - NYC) Responses due by 8/16/2023, (Koevary, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • Docket(#25) Pending Deadlines Terminated RE: Amended Motion to Extend Time (Amended Notice of Motion of Defendants to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) (related document(s)5) filed by Jonathan T. Koevary on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage; hearing not held, stricken moot; see doc.20. Response Moot. (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 06/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#8) filed by Jonathan T. Koevary on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage. (Koevary, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Motion to Extend Time (Amended Notice of Motion of Defendants to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) (related document(s)#5) filed by Jonathan T. Koevary on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage with hearing to be held on 6/21/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (CGM - NYC). (Koevary, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • Docket(#7) Pending Deadlines Terminated RE: Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (related document(s)1) filed by Jonathan T. Koevary on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage with hearing to be held on 6/22/2023 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (CGM - NYC); hearing not held, stricken moot; attorney to file amended notice of hearing.. (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 05/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#5) Filed by Jonathan T. Koevary on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage. (Koevary, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (related document(s)#1) filed by Jonathan T. Koevary on behalf of Lynne Florio, Malcolm Sage with hearing to be held on 6/22/2023 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (CGM - NYC). (Koevary, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service to Malcolm Sage (related document(s)#1, #2) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affidavit of Service to Lynne Florio (related document(s)#1, #2) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/19/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM), Answer due by 5/24/2023, (Ashmeade, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 23-01099-cgm) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16170253. Fee amount 350.00. (Re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 23-01099. Complaint against Malcolm Sage, Lynne Florio (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of IRVING H. PICARD, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Chapter 7 Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less