This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 05:12:14 (UTC).

Carol Diana Reneau

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Carol Diana Reneau in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-23483

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtor

Carol Diana Reneau

Lancaster, CA 93535

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Daniel King

Attorney at The Attorney Group

3435 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1111

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Carol Diana Reneau. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Property value is listed at an amount EQUAL to or GREATER THAN the Secured Amount Claimed: 1 included. Filed by Debtor Carol Diana Reneau. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Carol Diana Reneau. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Carol Diana Reneau. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Carol Diana Reneau (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27). (RE: related document(s) #2 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/09/2020 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/14/2020 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 01/24/2020. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Carol Diana Reneau. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Carol Diana Reneau. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Carol Diana Reneau. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Carol Diana Reneau. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Property value is listed at an amount EQUAL to or GREATER THAN the Secured Amount Claimed: 1 included. Filed by Debtor Carol Diana Reneau. (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Carol Diana Reneau (King, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less