This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/25/2020 at 09:17:28 (UTC).

Capvest Development LLC v. Timothy T and Martina O Smith, Trustees of the Tim

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 Capvest Development LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Timothy T and Martina O Smith, Trustees of the Tim. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-AP-01165

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capvest Development LLC

2443 W. Beverly Blvd

Montebello, CA 90640

Defendants

Timothy T and Martina O Smith, Trustees of the Timothy T and Martina O Smith Trust dated Jan 3, 2002; Bette L Herbst and Detlef O Herbst, Trustees of the Herbst Living Trust Dated August 4, 2000; Stev

Alliance Portfolio Private Equity Finance, Inc.

120 Vantis, Suite 515

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Julian K Bach

Attorney at Law Office of Julian Bach

7911 Warner Avenue

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Status Conference re Removal of Action

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Hearing Set re Notice of Status Conference re Removal (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Capvest Development LLC) Status hearing to be held on 9/8/2020 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Status Conference re Removal- Hearing Date: 9/8/2020 @ 2:00 p.m. Filed by Defendants Alliance Portfolio Private Equity Finance, Inc. , Timothy T and Martina O Smith, Trustees of the Timothy T and Martina O Smith Trust dated Jan 3, 2002; Bette L Herbst and Detlef O Herbst, Trustees of the Herbst Living Trust Dated August 4, 2000; Stev (RE: related document(s)#1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01165. Complaint by Capvest Development LLC against Timothy T and Martina O Smith, Trustees of the Timothy T and Martina O Smith Trust dated Jan 3, 2002; Bette L Herbst and Detlef O Herbst, Trustees of the Herbst Living Trust Dated August 4, 2000; Stev, Alliance Portfolio Private Equity Finance, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Status Conference re Removal of Action) Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause))). (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(2:20-ap-01165-WB) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51464872. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:20-ap-01165. Complaint by Capvest Development LLC against Timothy T and Martina O Smith, Trustees of the Timothy T and Martina O Smith Trust dated Jan 3, 2002; Bette L Herbst and Detlef O Herbst, Trustees of the Herbst Living Trust Dated August 4, 2000; Stev, Alliance Portfolio Private Equity Finance, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Status Conference re Removal of Action) Nature of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (Bach, Julian) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julian Karl Bach