This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/15/2021 at 21:21:28 (UTC).

Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC v. Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Peryam Kroll Research Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary F. Walrath. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-AP-51029

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Mary F. Walrath

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC

Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC, as Liquidating Trustee of the Orchids Paper Products Liquidating Trust

Defendant

Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation

323 N. Avondale Avenue

Chicago, IL 60631

Not Classified By Court

Ian Connor Bifferato

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc J. Phillips

Attorney at Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads LLP

1105 North Market Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.

Attorney at ASK LLP

2600 Eagan Woods Drive, Suite 400

St. Paul, MN 55121

Defendant Attorneys

Roland Gary Jones

Attorney at Jones & Associates

1325 Avenue Of The Americas, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

James Tobia

Attorney at The Law Office of James Tobia, LLC

1716 Wawaset Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Ian Connor Bifferato

Attorney at The Bifferato Firm

1007 N Orange Street, 4Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

20 #2

Order Assigning to Mediation: Notice Recipients

20 #1

Order Assigning to Mediation

#19

17 #2

Order Assigning to Mediation: Notice Recipients

17 #1

Order Assigning to Mediation

16 #1

Main Document

5 #2

Certificate of Service

5 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Certificate of Service

4 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Proof of Service

3 #1

Main Document

1 #3

Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAdversary Case 1:20-ap-51029 Closed (MB) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#20) Notice Date 05/20/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#17) Notice Date 05/19/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 7/19/2021. Signed on 5/18/2021. (LAM) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Ian Connor Bifferato Between Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC, as Liquidating Trustee of the Orchids Paper Products Liquidating Trust and Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation. Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Corrective Entry Counsel to file a Stipulation as to Mediator. (related document(s)#17) (LAM) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) *** ENTERED IN ERROR *** Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Martin J. Weis is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 7/19/2021. Signed on 5/17/2021. (LAM) Modified on 5/17/2021 as to text (LAM). Modified on 5/17/2021 (LAM). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Defendant Peryam & Kroll Research Co.'s Objections and Responses to the Plaintiffs First Set of Document Requests, First Set of Interrogatories, and First Set of Requests for Admissions, and Document Production Set 1) (Tobia, James) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Roland Gary Jones, Esq.. Receipt Number ADEDC-3525, Filed by Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Certification of Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice #2 Certificate of Service) (Tobia, James) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/17/2021 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Service re Scheduling Order Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Scheduling Order (related document(s)#6) Signed on 2/5/2021. (LMC) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to Complaint Filed by Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation Mediation due date: 05/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tobia, James) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance. Filed by Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Tobia, James) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation. (related document#1) Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Complaint(20-51029-MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10075557, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 20-51029. Complaint by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC against Peryam & Kroll Research Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives) (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian Connor Bifferato