This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/08/2021 at 13:26:26 (UTC).

Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC v. Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Freight Tec Management Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary F. Walrath. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-AP-51019

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Mary F. Walrath

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC, as Liquidating Trustee of the Orchids Paper Products Liquidating Trust

Defendant

Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.

190 N. Main Street, Suite 225

Bountiful, UT 84011

Not Classified By Court

Ian Connor Bifferato

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc J. Phillips

Attorney at Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads LLP

1105 North Market Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.

Attorney at ASK LLP

2600 Eagan Woods Drive, Suite 400

St. Paul, MN 55121

Defendant Attorneys

Chase B. Ames

Attorney at Skoubye Nielson & Johansen, LLC

999 E. Murray Holladay Rd., Suite 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84117

Stevan R. Baxter

Attorney at Skoubye Nielson & Johansen, LLC

999 E. Murray Holladay Rd., Suite 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84117

Kevin M. Capuzzi

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1201

Wilmington, DE 19801-1611

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Ian Connor Bifferato

Attorney at The Bifferato Firm

1007 N Orange Street, 4Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#24

#21

#20

19 #2

Order Assigning to Mediation: Notice Recipients

19 #1

Order Assigning to Mediation

#18

#17

#16

#15

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Proof of Service

3 #1

Main Document

1 #3

Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives

1 #2

Exhibit A

#1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#23) Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2021
  • Docket(#22) Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) (Entered: 08/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Service of Defendant Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.s Supplemental Initial Disclosures Filed by Freight Tec Management Group, Inc. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)#19) Notice Date 06/11/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 8/10/2021. Signed on 6/9/2021. (LAM) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Ian Connor Bifferato Between Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC, as Liquidating Trustee of the Orchids Paper Products Liquidating Trust and Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.. Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Service of Discovery re: Defendant Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.s Responses to First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Filed by Freight Tec Management Group, Inc. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Service of Defendant Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.s Initial Disclosures, along with the accompanying documents, Bates-stamped FT000001-FTMG000042 Filed by Freight Tec Management Group, Inc. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Chase B. Ames (Related Doc #7) Signed on 2/3/2021. (LMC) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Stevan R. Baxter (Related Doc #6) Signed on 2/3/2021. (LMC) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAttorney Chase B. Ames and Kevin M. Capuzzi for Freight Tec Management Group, Inc., Stevan R. Baxter and Kevin M. Capuzzi for Freight Tec Management Group, Inc. added to case Filed by Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Chase B. Ames, Esq.. Receipt Number 3504799, Filed by Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Stevan R. Baxter, Esq.. Receipt Number 3504799, Filed by Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance. Filed by Freight Tec Management Group, Inc. (Capuzzi, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC and Freight Tec Management Group, Inc. . Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC. (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.. (related document#1) Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Complaint(20-51019-MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10075557, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 20-51019. Complaint by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC against Freight Tec Management Group, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives) (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian Connor Bifferato