This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/08/2021 at 20:46:16 (UTC).

Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against AT T Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary F. Walrath. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-AP-51041

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Mary F. Walrath

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC

Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC, as Liquidating Trustee of the Orchids Paper Products Liquidating Trust

Defendant

AT&T Mobility LLC

1025 Lenox Park Boulevard Ne

Atlanta, GA 30319-5309

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.

Attorney at ASK LLP

2600 Eagan Woods Drive, Suite 400

St. Paul, MN 55121

Marc J. Phillips

Attorney at Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads LLP

1105 North Market Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives

3 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Proof of Service

4 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Certificate of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketAdversary Case 1:20-ap-51041 Closed (LAM) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC. (related document#1) Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Complaint(20-51041-MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 10081729, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 20-51041. Complaint by Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC against AT&T Mobility LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 3/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives) (Phillips, Marc) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Buchwald Capital Advisors LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc J. Phillips(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.