This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2020 at 06:32:56 (UTC).

Brian Family, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 Brian Family, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-42064

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtor

Brian Family, LLC

9587 Mulberry Lane

Frisco, TX 75033

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Trustee

Scott SEIDEL (SBRA V)

Plano, TX 75093

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Michael S. Mitchell

Attorney at DeMarco-Mitchell, PLLC

1255 West 15Th Street, 805

Plano, TX 75075

Robert T. DeMarco

Attorney at DeMarco-Mitchell, PLLC

1255 West 15Th St., 805

Plano, TX 75075

Us Trustee Attorney

John M. Vardeman

Attorney at UST Office

110 N. College St., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#49

(#49) Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule A/B, Amendment: to reflect licensing agreement with Artis, LP erroneously omitted from original schedules Filed by Brian Family, LLC Document Due 12/1/2020. (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#48

(#48) Notice of Debtor's Cash Collateral Budget for the Month of December, 2020 Filed By Michael S. Mitchell Filed by on behalf of Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#39 Agreed Final Order Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral(RE: related document(s)#5 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Brian Family, LLC (slt)). (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 11/25/2020 (slt). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#47

(#47) Operating Report for Filing Period October, 2020 Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#46

(#46) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#45 A telephonic hearing will be held on 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM to consider and act upon the Subchapter V Consensual Reorganization Report (Status Report) (by Subchapter V Debtor) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC filed as document number #41.). Notice Date 11/15/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/15/2020)

#45

(#45) A telephonic hearing will be held on 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM to consider and act upon the Subchapter V Consensual Reorganization Report (Status Report) (by Subchapter V Debtor) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC filed as document number #41. (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#44

(#44) Objection Filed by TBank (RE: related document(s)#41 Debtor's Subchapter V Status Report Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2020 (slt). filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Katz, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#41

(#44) Objection Filed by TBank (RE: related document(s)#41 Debtor's Subchapter V Status Report Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2020 (slt). filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Katz, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#39

(#48) Notice of Debtor's Cash Collateral Budget for the Month of December, 2020 Filed By Michael S. Mitchell Filed by on behalf of Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#39 Agreed Final Order Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral(RE: related document(s)#5 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Brian Family, LLC (slt)). (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 11/25/2020 (slt). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

34 #1

Main Document

#5

Proposed Order

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit B

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Main Document

#4

(#4) Declaration re Cash Flow Statement Filed By Michael S. Mitchell Filed by on behalf of Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Brian Family, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/30/2020.Document Due 10/8/2020. filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 10/2/2020 (lc). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Balance Sheet Filed By Michael S. Mitchell Filed by on behalf of Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Brian Family, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/30/2020.Document Due 10/8/2020. filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 10/2/2020 (lc). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Statement of Operations for Small Business Debtor for Filing Period January 1, 2020 through August 31, 2020 Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#1

(#9) Certificate of Service of Declaration of David A. Brian Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC, #6 Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Salaries and Wages Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC, #7 Motion for Authority to Pay Critical Vendor Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC, #8 Request for Expedited Hearing On Debtor's First Day Motions Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule A/B, Amendment: to reflect licensing agreement with Artis, LP erroneously omitted from original schedules Filed by Brian Family, LLC Document Due 12/1/2020. (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Notice of Debtor's Cash Collateral Budget for the Month of December, 2020 Filed By Michael S. Mitchell Filed by on behalf of Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#39 Agreed Final Order Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral(RE: related document(s)#5 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Brian Family, LLC (slt)). (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 11/25/2020 (slt). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Operating Report for Filing Period October, 2020 Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketHearing Held: Debtor to submit proof of dip accounts by 11/20/20. (RE: related document(s) #41 Debtor's Subchapter V Status Report Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2020 ). (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketHearing Held: Status Hearing held.. (RE: related document(s) #1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Brian Family, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/30/2020.Document Due 10/8/2020.). (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#45 A telephonic hearing will be held on 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM to consider and act upon the Subchapter V Consensual Reorganization Report (Status Report) (by Subchapter V Debtor) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC filed as document number #41.). Notice Date 11/15/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) A telephonic hearing will be held on 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM to consider and act upon the Subchapter V Consensual Reorganization Report (Status Report) (by Subchapter V Debtor) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC filed as document number #41. (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Objection Filed by TBank (RE: related document(s)#41 Debtor's Subchapter V Status Report Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2020 (slt). filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Katz, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#42 Order Authorizing Employment of DeMarco-Mitchell, PLLC as Counsel for the Debtor (RE: related document(s)#34 Application to Employ DeMarco-Mitchell, PLLC Filed by Brian Family, LLC . (slt)). Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Order Authorizing Employment of DeMarco-Mitchell, PLLC as Counsel for the Debtor (RE: related document(s)#34 Application to Employ DeMarco-Mitchell, PLLC Filed by Brian Family, LLC . (slt) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Service of Declaration of David A. Brian Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#5 Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC, #6 Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Salaries and Wages Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC, #7 Motion for Authority to Pay Critical Vendor Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC, #8 Request for Expedited Hearing On Debtor's First Day Motions Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Expedited Hearing On Debtor's First Day Motions Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Authority to Pay Critical Vendor Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Salaries and Wages Filed by Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Proposed Order) (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration re Cash Flow Statement Filed By Michael S. Mitchell Filed by on behalf of Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Brian Family, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/30/2020.Document Due 10/8/2020. filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 10/2/2020 (lc). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Balance Sheet Filed By Michael S. Mitchell Filed by on behalf of Brian Family, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Brian Family, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/30/2020.Document Due 10/8/2020. filed by Debtor Brian Family, LLC). (Mitchell, Michael) Modified on 10/2/2020 (lc). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Operations for Small Business Debtor for Filing Period January 1, 2020 through August 31, 2020 Filed by Brian Family, LLC (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-42064) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11780962, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition. With Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Brian Family, LLC, Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/30/2020.Document Due 10/8/2020.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M. Vardeman