This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2019 at 05:06:40 (UTC).

Borish et al v. Tabingo et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Borish filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Tabingo. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Ernest M. Robles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-AP-01144

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Ernest M. Robles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ami Borish

Stephen Borish

Defendants

Celgine Tabingo

Allan J Macquarrie

MyKarmabox.com

KarmaBox Vending

Clarke Miller

Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive

Urban Vendor, Inc

Trustee

Timothy Yoo (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roxanne Bonar

Attorney at Bonar Law Group

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued on Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; KarmaBox Vending Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; Allan J Macquarrie Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; Clarke Miller Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; MyKarmabox.com Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; Celgine Tabingo Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; Urban Vendor, Inc Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint) Status hearing to be held on 8/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Re: courtroom procedures. Trial week of 4-27-20 at 9:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/17/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint). (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #4

Complaint

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#1

Main Document

#3

(#3) Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/17/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Discovery due by 3/28/2020. Trial date set for 4/27/2020 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #3

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint) Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 4/27/2020 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Re: courtroom procedures. Trial week of 4-27-20 at 9:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/17/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint). (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/17/2019. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Discovery due by 3/28/2020. Trial date set for 4/27/2020 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued on Does 1 Through 20, Inclusive Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; KarmaBox Vending Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; Allan J Macquarrie Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; Clarke Miller Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; MyKarmabox.com Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; Celgine Tabingo Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019; Urban Vendor, Inc Date Issued 5/17/2019, Answer Due 6/17/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint) Status hearing to be held on 8/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Complaint(2:19-ap-01144-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49071730. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Adversary case 2:19-ap-01144. Complaint by Stephen & Ami Borish against Allen Joseph MacQuarrie. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet #2 Summons #3 Complaint) Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (Bonar, Roxanne) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less