This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/01/2021 at 06:36:34 (UTC).

Bhumi Real Estate LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Bhumi Real Estate LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New Jersey Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael B. Kaplan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-BK-11710

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Michael B. Kaplan

 

Party Details

Debtor

Bhumi Real Estate LLC

579 Arlington Avenue

South Plainfield, NJ 07080

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

One Newark Center Ste 2100

Newark, NJ 07102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

David L. Stevens

Attorney at Scura, Wigfield, Heyer & Stevens

1599 Hamburg Turnpike

Wayne, NJ 07470

Us Trustee Attorney

Lauren Bielskie

Attorney at DOJ-Ust

One Newark Center, Suite 2100

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER GRANTING 100 MILE NORTHEASTS MOTION 1) FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY UNDER 11 U.S.C. 362 TO FORECLOSE ON PROPERTY AND 2) FOR AN ORDER A) DETERMINING THAT THE AUTOMATIC STAY DOES NOT APPLY TO RENTS THAT THE DEBTOR ABSOLUTELY ASSIGNED TO 100 MILE NORTHEAST, LLC, B) AUTHORIZING THE DISGORGEMENT OF RENTS RECEIVED BY THE DEBTOR POST-PETITION, AND C) DIRECTING THAT 100 MILE NORTHEAST, LLC IS ENTITLED TO COLLECT ALL SUCH FUTURE RENTS. (Related Doc #10). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/30/2021. (wir) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

10 #12

Exhibit I

10 #11

Exhibit H

#10

Exhibit G

10 #9

Exhibit F

10 #8

Exhibit E

10 #7

Exhibit D

10 #6

Exhibit C

10 #5

Exhibit B

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Daniel J. Cohen on behalf of 100 Mile Northeast, LLC. (Cohen, Daniel) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/05/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/06/2021)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/05/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/06/2021)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/05/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Bielskie on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bielskie, Lauren) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#3

(#3) CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/30/2021. filed by Debtor Bhumi Real Estate LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#2

Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (related document:#2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by U.S. Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Continued to 4/19/2021 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic. (UST Staff03) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#4

(#4) Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/2/2021. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wdr) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#1

(#3) CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/30/2021. filed by Debtor Bhumi Real Estate LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER GRANTING 100 MILE NORTHEASTS MOTION 1) FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY UNDER 11 U.S.C. 362 TO FORECLOSE ON PROPERTY AND 2) FOR AN ORDER A) DETERMINING THAT THE AUTOMATIC STAY DOES NOT APPLY TO RENTS THAT THE DEBTOR ABSOLUTELY ASSIGNED TO 100 MILE NORTHEAST, LLC, B) AUTHORIZING THE DISGORGEMENT OF RENTS RECEIVED BY THE DEBTOR POST-PETITION, AND C) DIRECTING THAT 100 MILE NORTHEAST, LLC IS ENTITLED TO COLLECT ALL SUCH FUTURE RENTS. (Related Doc #10). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/30/2021. (wir) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Scheduled. (related document:#26 Application For Retention of Professional Harit Kapadia as CPA Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. The follow up deadline is 03/23/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Cert retention of Professional- CPA-amended # 2 Order Authorizing Retention- Proposed order-amended) filed by Debtor Bhumi Real Estate LLC) Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (kmm) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/24/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Application For Retention of Professional Harit Kapadia as CPA Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. The follow up deadline is 03/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Cert retention of Professional- CPA-amended #2 Order Authorizing Retention- Proposed order-amended) (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Withdrawal of Document (related document:#20 Application for Retention filed by Debtor Bhumi Real Estate LLC) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Hearing Scheduled OBJECTION TO: (related document:#20 Application For Retention of Professional Harit Kapadia as CPA Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Proposed Order) (Stevens, David) TEXT/MODIFIED (wir) filed by Debtor Bhumi Real Estate LLC) Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2021 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Objection to Retention of Pandya Kapadia Bhatt & Associates CPA, P.C. (related document:#20 Application For Retention of Professional Harit Kapadia as CPA Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Proposed Order) (Stevens, David) TEXT/MODIFIED (wir) filed by Debtor Bhumi Real Estate LLC) filed by Lauren Bielskie on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bielskie, Lauren) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (related document:#2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by U.S. Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Continued to 4/19/2021 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic. (UST Staff03) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute of 4/15/21; ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED (related document(s): #10 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by 100 Mile Northeast, LLC) (kmm) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATION in support of (related document:#19 Response filed by Creditor 100 Mile Northeast, LLC) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Stevens, David) Modified on 4/15/2021 (wdr). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Daniel J. Cohen on behalf of 100 Mile Northeast, LLC. (Cohen, Daniel) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/05/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/05/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/05/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Bielskie on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bielskie, Lauren) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/30/2021. filed by Debtor Bhumi Real Estate LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/1/2021 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 5/11/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/30/2021. (mrg) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/2/2021. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2021 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wdr) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11710) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A42234338, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of Bhumi Real Estate LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/30/2021. (Stevens, David) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Bielskie