This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 02/03/2023 at 06:32:00 (UTC).

Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Grace E. Robson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-BK-04313

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Grace E. Robson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC

4700 Millenia Blvd., Ste. 400

Orlando, FL 32839

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building

Not Classified By Court

Mark Wolfson, Esq. Creditor Committee c/o

Tampa, FL 33602-5810

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

R Scott Shuker

Attorney at Shuker & Dorris, P.A.

121 South Orange Avenue, Suite 1120

Orlando, FL 32801

Us Trustee Attorney

Audrey M Aleskovsky

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

George C. Young Federal Building

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Mark J. Wolfson

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

100 North Tampa Street, Suite 2700, Po Box 3391

Tampa, FL 33601

Kevin A Reck

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

301 E. Pine Street, Suite 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#123

(#123) Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Application to Employ GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC d/b/a B. RILEY ADVISORY SERVICES as Financial Advisor Filed by Mark J. Wolfson on behalf of Creditor Committee Filed by Mark J. Wolfson on behalf of Creditor Committee Mark Wolfson, Esq. Creditor Committee c/o (related document(s)#117). Hearing scheduled for 2/7/2023 at 10:30 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Wolfson, Mark) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#120

(#120) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #115)). Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2023)

#119

(#119) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #114)). Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2023)

#118

(#118) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Samuel C. Wisotzkey on behalf of Creditor Ecolab Inc.. (Wisotzkey, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

117 #3

Exhibit B-Declaration of Susan M. Smith

117 #2

Exhibit A-Proposed Order

117 #1

Main Document

#116

(#116) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Alicia M Kupcinskas on behalf of Creditor Christine Pageau. (Kupcinskas, Alicia) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#115

(#115) Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Laurel D Roglen for FR White Marsh, LLC; 523 Restaurant LP and E3 Realty MA Advisors, LLC. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded (Related Doc #112). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#114

(#114) Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Leslie C Heilman for FR White Marsh, LLC; 523 Restaurant LP and E3 Realty MA Advisors, LLC. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded (Related Doc #111). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Necessity and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (related document(s)#6, #7, #5, #4). (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#7

(#8) Certificate of Necessity and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (related document(s)#6, #7, #5, #4). (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#6

(#8) Certificate of Necessity and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (related document(s)#6, #7, #5, #4). (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#5

(#8) Certificate of Necessity and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (related document(s)#6, #7, #5, #4). (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#4

(#8) Certificate of Necessity and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (related document(s)#6, #7, #5, #4). (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#3

(#3) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC. (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#2

(#2) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC. (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#1

(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). List of Creditors holding the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims, Declaration, List of Equity Security Holders, Verification of Creditor Matrix, and Creditor Matrix Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 04/4/2023. Disclosure Statement due by 04/4/2023. (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Application to Employ GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC d/b/a B. RILEY ADVISORY SERVICES as Financial Advisor Filed by Mark J. Wolfson on behalf of Creditor Committee Filed by Mark J. Wolfson on behalf of Creditor Committee Mark Wolfson, Esq. Creditor Committee c/o (related document(s)#117). Hearing scheduled for 2/7/2023 at 10:30 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Wolfson, Mark) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Scheduled for 02/07/2023 10:30 AM Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6D, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Re: Application to Employ GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC d/b/a B. RILEY ADVISORY SERVICES as Financial Advisor Doc #117. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Mark J. Wolfson is directed to prepare, file and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, the notice must be done immediately. Failure to comply with this instruction will result in cancellation of the hearing on this specific matter. (related document(s)#117). (Bill) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #115)). Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #114)). Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Samuel C. Wisotzkey on behalf of Creditor Ecolab Inc.. (Wisotzkey, Samuel) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) Application to Employ GLASSRATNER ADVISORY & CAPITAL GROUP LLC d/b/a B. RILEY ADVISORY SERVICES as Financial Advisor Filed by Mark J. Wolfson on behalf of Creditor Committee Mark Wolfson, Esq. Creditor Committee c/o (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Susan M. Smith) (Wolfson, Mark) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Alicia M Kupcinskas on behalf of Creditor Christine Pageau. (Kupcinskas, Alicia) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Laurel D Roglen for FR White Marsh, LLC; 523 Restaurant LP and E3 Realty MA Advisors, LLC. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded (Related Doc #112). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Leslie C Heilman for FR White Marsh, LLC; 523 Restaurant LP and E3 Realty MA Advisors, LLC. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded (Related Doc #111). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) Notice of Compliance with Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Michael A Paasch on behalf of Creditor Ecolab Inc. (related document(s)#96). (Paasch, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Necessity and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (related document(s)#6, #7, #5, #4). (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency Motion to Reject Unexpired Leases of Non-Residential Real Property Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Request for Emergency Preliminary Hearing Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages , Salaries, and Benefits, Reimburse Prepetition Employees' Medical Benefit and Business Expenses and Request for Emergency Hearing Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion for Authority to Maintain Pre-Petition Bank Accounts Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC. (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 6:22-bk-04313) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A71382672, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Debtor Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC. (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Fee Paid.). List of Creditors holding the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims, Declaration, List of Equity Security Holders, Verification of Creditor Matrix, and Creditor Matrix Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by R Scott Shuker on behalf of Bertucci's Restaurants, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 04/4/2023. Disclosure Statement due by 04/4/2023. (Shuker, R) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bertucci's Restaurant Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark J Wolfson