This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2019 05:19:21

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 case was filed by Bernadette Ann Oliver in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details

  • Case Number 8:19-BK-11931
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Bankruptcy - Chapter 13
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Bankruptcy Courts
  • Judge Erithe A. Smith
  • Courthouse California Central Bankruptcy

Party Details

  • Debtor Bernadette Ann Oliver
  • Represented By
    • Nicholas M Wajda
  • Us Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Trustee Amrane (SA) Cohen (TR)
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Bernad...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/26/2019 at 11:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/30/2019 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5A, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 07/26/2019. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(8:19-bk-11931) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49074303. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Bernadette Ann Oliver. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Bernadette Ann Oliver. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Bernadette Ann Oliver Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 05/31/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 05/31/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 05/31/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 05/31/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 05/31/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 05/31/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 05/31/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 05/31/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 05/31/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 05/31/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 05/31/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 05/31/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 05/31/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 05/31/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 05/31/2019. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 05/31/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 05/31/2019. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 05/31/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 05/31/2019. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.