This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/16/2021 at 06:30:18 (UTC).

Benson Property Investment Corp

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 Benson Property Investment Corp was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Caryl E. Delano. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-00336

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Caryl E. Delano

 

Party Details

Debtor

Benson Property Investment Corp

12221 Towne Lake Dr Ste A-120

Fort Myers, FL 33913

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - FTM

Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200, 501 E. Polk Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Richard A Johnston, Jr.

Attorney at Johnston Law, PLLC

7370 College Parkway, Suite 207

Fort Myers, FL 33907

Us Trustee Attorney

Benjamin E. Lambers

Attorney at Timberlake Annex

501 E. Polk Street, Suite 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

36 #1

Main Document

34 #2

Exhibit A - Amended Final Judgment

34 #1

Main Document

7 #3

Mailing Matrix

7 #2

Affidavit

7 #1

Main Document

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #41)). Notice Date 05/13/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Proof of Service of Order Granting Riverpoint Capital Partners, LLC's Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Discovery. Filed by Jeffrey W. Leasure on behalf of Creditor Riverpoint Capital Partners LLC (related document(s)#39). (Leasure, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time (Related Doc #37) to Respond to Discovery Service Instructions: Jeffrey Leasure is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Case pursuant to 11 USC 1112(b) Filed by Jeffrey W. Leasure on behalf of Creditor Riverpoint Capital Partners LLC (related document(s)#34). Hearing scheduled for 5/26/2021 at 10:30 AM at Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-102, Hearing Room, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL. (Leasure, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Scheduled for 05/26/2021 10:30 AM Ft. Myers, FL - Room 4-102, Hearing Room, United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Ft. Myers, FL. Re: Motion to Dismiss Case pursuant to 11 USC 1112(b). Doc #34. This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions: Jeffrey W. Leasure is directed to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, the preparation, filing and service must be done immediately. Failure to comply with the noticing instructions will result in cancellation of the hearing that addresses this specific matter. Telephonic Appearance Requirement: Effective March 16, 2020, and continuing until further notice, Judges in all Divisions will conduct all preliminary and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. For Judges Colton and Williamson, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Solutions (www.court-solutions.com). For Judges Delano, Funk, Jackson, Jennemann, McEwen, and Vaughan, parties should arrange a telephonic appearance through Court Call (866-582-6878). Should the Court decide to hold this hearing by Zoom, the Court will enter a subsequent Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearing. For hearings held by Zoom, parties should arrange to attend via Zoom only. Parties that wish to listen only, who do not anticipate active participation, or who lack technology to participate by video may participate telephonically only. (related document(s)#34). (Dkt) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Discovery Filed by Jeffrey W. Leasure on behalf of Creditor Riverpoint Capital Partners LLC (Leasure, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Jeffrey W. Leasure on behalf of Creditor Riverpoint Capital Partners LLC (related document(s)#34). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Final Judgment #2 Exhibit B - Voluntary Petition filed on March 17, 2021 #3 Exhibit C - Amended Voluntary Petition filed on March 18, 202 #4 Exhibit D - Schedules A/B, D, E/F, and Statement of Financial Affairs #5 Exhibit E - Amended Statement of Financial Affairs filed on April 15, 2021) (Leasure, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) First Request for Admissions Filed by Jeffrey W. Leasure on behalf of Creditor Riverpoint Capital Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Final Judgment #2 Exhibit B - Voluntary Petition filed on March 17, 2021 #3 Exhibit C - Amended Voluntary Petition filed on March 18, 202 #4 Exhibit D - Schedules A/B, D, E/F, and Statement of Financial Affairs #5 Exhibit E - Amended Statement of Financial Affairs filed on April 15, 2021) (Leasure, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Motion to Dismiss Case pursuant to 11 USC 1112(b). Filed by Jeffrey W. Leasure on behalf of Creditor Riverpoint Capital Partners LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Final Judgment) (Leasure, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application to Employ Richard Johnston, Jr. of Johnston Law, PLLC as Debtor's attorney Filed by Richard A Johnston Jr. on behalf of Debtor Benson Property Investment Corp (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Mailing Matrix) (Johnston, Richard) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Caryl E. Delano, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is US Trustee. (Ellen M.) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDebtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at #http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf. (ADIclerk) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement/Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Filed by Richard A Johnston Jr. on behalf of Debtor Benson Property Investment Corp. (Johnston, Richard) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Richard A Johnston Jr. on behalf of Debtor Benson Property Investment Corp. (Johnston, Richard) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Richard A Johnston Jr. on behalf of Debtor Benson Property Investment Corp. (Johnston, Richard) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Richard A Johnston Jr. on behalf of Debtor Benson Property Investment Corp. (Johnston, Richard) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Richard A Johnston Jr. on behalf of Debtor Benson Property Investment Corp. (Johnston, Richard) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:21-bk-00336) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number 66832972, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Filed by Richard A Johnston Jr. on behalf of Benson Property Investment Corp. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 06/15/2021. (Johnston, Richard) Modified on 3/18/2021 (Jeffery). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin E. Lambers(Designation Retained)