This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2020 at 06:34:38 (UTC).

Benevis, LLC Jointly Administered under 20-33918.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Benevis, LLC Jointly Administered under 20-33918 was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin Isgur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-33922

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Marvin Isgur

 

Party Details

Debtors

Benevis, LLC Jointly Administered under 20-33918.

Benevis, LLC

1090 Northchase Parkway Se, Suite 150

Marietta, GA 30067

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Matthew D Cavenaugh

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

1401 Mckinney Street, Ste 1900

Houston, TX 77010

Veronica Ann Polnick

Attorney at Jackson Walker, LLP

1401 Mckinney St., Suite 1900

Houston, TX 77010

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-33922) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22334957. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/05/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docket(#5) No Creditor Mailing List (JosephWellsadi) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#4) Amended Petition (Filed By Benevis, LLC ). (Cavenaugh, Matthew) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketJudge Marvin Isgur is added to the case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones is terminated. (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 20-33918 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#3) Order for Joint Administration under 20-33918. Signed on 8/3/2020 (LinhthuDoadi) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Benevis, LLC. (Polnick, Veronica) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BENEVIS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Veronica Ann Polnick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew D Cavenaugh