This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/16/2021 at 06:32:03 (UTC).

Basic Energy Services, L.P. Jointly Administered under 21-90002.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 Basic Energy Services, L P Jointly Administered under 21-90002 was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is David R Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-90001

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

David R Jones

 

Party Details

Debtors

Basic Energy Services, L.P. Jointly Administered under 21-90002.

Basic Energy Services, L.P.

801 Cherry Streetsuite 2100

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Us Trustee

US Trustee, 11

515 Rusk Aveste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Alfredo R Perez

Attorney at Weil Gotshal et al

700 Louisianaste 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Us Trustee Attorney

Jayson B. Ruff

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

515 Rusk St.Ste. 3516

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/20/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/19/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by PRA Receivables Management, LLC (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice and Order regarding exchanging of exhibits and witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings. (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketAn order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 21-90002 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (aalo) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order for Joint Administration under 21-90002. Signed on 8/17/2021 (aalo) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jayson B. Ruff (Ruff, Jayson) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-90001) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23213105. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Basic Energy Services, L.P.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BASIC ENERGY SERVICES LP, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jayson B. Ruff