This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 05:08:22 (UTC).

Barbara Savage

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Barbara Savage was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandra R. Klein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-BK-10088

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Sandra R. Klein

 

Party Details

Debtor

Barbara Savage

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Kathy A Dockery (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017.Objection 523 Complaint Due: 4/14/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 3/16/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/6/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 3/12/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sandra R. Klein (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Barbara Savage . (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Barbara Savage . (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Barbara Savage . (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017.Objection 523 Complaint Due: 4/14/2020. Proofs of Claims due by 3/16/2020. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/6/2020. Confirmation hearing to be held on 3/12/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sandra R. Klein (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Judge Sandra R. Klein added to case due to prior case 2:19-bk-24196-SK. (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Barbara Savage Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 1/21/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 1/21/2020. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 1/21/2020. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 1/21/2020. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 1/21/2020. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 1/21/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 1/21/2020. (Cowan, Sarah) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.