This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/29/2021 at 06:30:57 (UTC).

Balance Point LLC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Balance Point LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is J Kate Stickles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11279

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

J Kate Stickles

 

Party Details

Debtor

Balance Point LLC

19799 Sw 95Th Avenue, Suite B

Tualatin, OR 97062

Trustee

David M. Klauder

Wilmington, DE 19801

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building

844 King Street, SU 2207

Not Classified By Court

Stretto

410 Exchange, Ste 100

Irvine, CA 92602

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Trinitee G. Green

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Jeremy R. Johnson

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

600 3Rd Avenue, 42Nd Floor

New York, NY 10016

Shanti M. Katona

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1101

Wilmington, DE 19801

Us Trustee Attorney

Joseph James McMahon, Jr.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox #35

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

56 #3

Exhibit A

56 #2

Notice

56 #1

Main Document

55 #3

Exhibit A

55 #2

Notice

55 #1

Main Document

54 #3

Exhibit A

54 #2

Notice

54 #1

Main Document

7 #3

Exhibit A

7 #2

Schedule 1

7 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Main Document

#4

3 #2

Exhibit A

3 #1

Main Document

#1

215 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) Affidavit/Declaration of Service (Supplemental) re: Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals (Docket No. 54), Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing Retention and Payment of Professionals Utilized by Debtors in Ordinary Course of Business (Docket No. 55), Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Establishing Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim, (II) Approving Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, and (III) Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Bar Dates to Potential Unknown Creditors (Docket No. 56), Notice of Bar Date for Filing of Proofs of Claim, Including Section 503(b)(9) Claims (attached hereto as Exhibit B), and [Customized] Official Form 410 Proof of Claim and Instructions. Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#54, #55, #56) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: First Monthly Fee Application of Polsinelli PC for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors In Possession for the Period From September 30, 2021 Through October 31, 2021 (Docket No. 112). Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#112) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2021 for MECTA Corporation Filed by Balance Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documentation) (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period October 2021 Filed by Balance Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documentation) (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) Monthly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors for the period from September 30, 2021 to October 31, 2021 Filed by Polsinelli PC. Objections due by 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A) (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#111) Transcript regarding Hearing Held 11/4/2021 RE: Second Day Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/22/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/29/2021. Redaction Request Due By 12/13/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/27/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/22/2022. (MD) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) Affidavit/Declaration of Service (Supplemental) re: Notice of Status Conference (Docket No. 44), Debtors Application for Appointment of Stretto as Administrative Advisor Effective October 5, 2021 (Docket No. 47), Application of the Debtors to Employ and Retain Wyse Advisors LLC as Financial Advisor to Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 48), and Application of Debtors for Authority to Employ and Retain Polsinelli PC as Counsel to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 49). Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#44, #47, #48, #49) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Application of Debtors for Authority to Employ and Retain Arrow Advisory, LLC as the Accountant Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 108). Filed by Stretto. (related document(s)#108) (Betance, Sheryl) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Arrow Advisory, LLC as Accountant Filed by Balance Point LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2021 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B) (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) Affidavit / Notice of Filing of Affidavit of Miller Nash, LLP (related document(s)#93) Filed by Balance Point LLC. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers From Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services, (II) Approving the Debtors Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment for Post-Petition Services, and (III) Establishing Procedures for Resolving Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance of Payment Filed By Balance Point LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C)(Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions / Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtors to (I) Maintain and Renew Existing Insurance Policies and Pay All Obligations Arising Therefrom; and (II) Continue Insurance Premium Financing Programs, Pay Insurance Premium Financing Obligations Arising Thereunder, and Renew or Enter Into New Premium Financing Agreements in the Ordinary Course Filed By Balance Point LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B)(Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (I) Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System, Including Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts, Checks, and Business Forms, and (II) Continuation of Existing Deposit Practices Filed By Balance Point LLC (Attachments: #1 Schedule 1 #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B)(Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to File Under Seal / Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtors to Redact Certain Personnel Information Filed by Balance Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#5) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11279) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10506727, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement of Disinterestedness. David M. Klauder added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (McCollum, Hannah) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration of Related Subchapter V Cases Filed by Balance Point LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) Judge J Kate Stickles added to case. Involvement of Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon Terminated (MD) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketJudge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (MD) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Balance Point LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 12/29/2021. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stretto is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph James McMahon, Jr.