This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2019 at 05:07:24 (UTC).

Ashley Georgette Aguero

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 case was filed by Ashley Georgette Aguero in the jurisdiction of U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-24270

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Barry Russell

 

Party Details

Debtor

Ashley Georgette Aguero

Downey, CA 90242

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Wesley H Avery (TR)

Pasadena, CA 91101

 

Court Documents

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Ashley Georgette Aguero . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Ashley Georgette Aguero (Collins, Kim S.) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019 (Collins, Kim S.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Ashley Georgette Aguero . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/07/2020 at 11:00 AM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 03/09/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 03/09/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Order Granting Application To Proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #6). Signed on 12/6/2019. (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Ashley Georgette Aguero (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Granting Application To Proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #6). Signed on 12/6/2019. (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Application to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by Debtor Ashley Georgette Aguero (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Ashley Georgette Aguero . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Ashley Georgette Aguero . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Ashley Georgette Aguero . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/07/2020 at 11:00 AM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 03/09/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 03/09/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Ashley Georgette Aguero (Collins, Kim S.) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019 (Collins, Kim S.). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less