This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/04/2023 at 06:30:21 (UTC).

Argonaut Insurance Company v. Thunder, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2023 Argonaut Insurance Company filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Thunder, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Barry Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-AP-01076

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Barry Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Argonaut Insurance Company

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

Thunder, Inc.

U.S. Small Business Administration

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

BankDirect Capital Finance

PACE Finance Corporation

B.S.D. Capital, Inc. dba Lendistry

Century 21 Real Estate LLC

Franchise Tax Board

Internal Revenue Service

Trustee

Gregory Kent Jones (TR)

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Robert J Berens

Raymond H. Aver

Mohammad Tehrani

David S Catuogno

Jolene Tanner

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#36 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/02/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/02/2023)

#36

(#36) Order Granting Stipulation and ORDER thereon to extend time to answer (see order for details)(BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #35 ) Signed on 3/31/2023 (SF) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#35

(#35) Stipulation By PACE Finance Corporation and Argonaut Insurance Company Filed by Defendant PACE Finance Corporation (Tehrani, Mohammad) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#34

(#34) Summons Service Executed on Internal Revenue Service 3/22/2023 (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#33

(#33) Summons Service Executed on U.S. Small Business Administration 3/22/2023 (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

31 #2

Proposed Order

31 #1

Main Document

#30

(#30) Another Summons Issued on Internal Revenue Service Date Issued 3/21/2023, Answer Due 4/25/2023; U.S. Small Business Administration Date Issued 3/21/2023, Answer Due 4/25/2023 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint #19 Status report Status hearing to be held on 5/23/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#19

(#30) Another Summons Issued on Internal Revenue Service Date Issued 3/21/2023, Answer Due 4/25/2023; U.S. Small Business Administration Date Issued 3/21/2023, Answer Due 4/25/2023 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint #19 Status report Status hearing to be held on 5/23/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

1 #11

Exhibit "10"

1 #10

Exhibit "9"

1 #9

Exhibit "8"

1 #7

Exhibit "6"

1 #6

Exhibit "5"

1 #5

Exhibit "4"

1 #4

Exhibit "3"

1 #3

Exhibit "2"

1 #2

Exhibit "1"

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#36 Stipulation and ORDER thereon (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/02/2023. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) Order Granting Stipulation and ORDER thereon to extend time to answer (see order for details)(BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #35 ) Signed on 3/31/2023 (SF) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) Stipulation By PACE Finance Corporation and Argonaut Insurance Company Filed by Defendant PACE Finance Corporation (Tehrani, Mohammad) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) Summons Service Executed on Internal Revenue Service 3/22/2023 (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) Summons Service Executed on U.S. Small Business Administration 3/22/2023 (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - (Attorney needs to correct stipulation, non filing attorney for the stipulation such as plaintiff's attorney should manually sign the stipulation. (See Central Guide) The order should be uploaded in LOU. (RE: related document(s)#31 Stipulation filed by Defendant PACE Finance Corporation) (SF) Modified on 3/22/2023 (SF). (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) Stipulation By PACE Finance Corporation and Argonaut Insurance Company Filed by Defendant PACE Finance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tehrani, Mohammad) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) Another Summons Issued on Internal Revenue Service Date Issued 3/21/2023, Answer Due 4/25/2023; U.S. Small Business Administration Date Issued 3/21/2023, Answer Due 4/25/2023 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint #19 Status report Status hearing to be held on 5/23/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - [Attorney needs to file a declaration for each request] (RE: related document(s)#25 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company, #26 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company, #27 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company) (SF) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) Answer to Complaint Filed by Century 21 Real Estate LLC. (Catuogno, David) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Summons Service Executed on BankDirect Capital Finance 2/17/2023 (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Summons Service Executed on BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. 2/17/2023 (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Summons Service Executed on U.S. Small Business Administration 2/17/2023 (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Service Executed on Thunder, Inc. 2/17/2023 (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Notice to Defendant Re: Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Locak Bankruptcy Rules Filed by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Another Summons Issued on B.S.D. Capital, Inc. dba Lendistry Date Issued 2/13/2023, Answer Due 3/15/2023; BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. Date Issued 2/13/2023, Answer Due 3/15/2023; BankDirect Capital Finance Date Issued 2/13/2023, Answer Due 3/15/2023; Century 21 Real Estate LLC Date Issued 2/13/2023, Answer Due 3/15/2023; Franchise Tax Board Date Issued 2/13/2023, Answer Due 3/15/2023; Internal Revenue Service Date Issued 2/13/2023, Answer Due 3/15/2023; PACE Finance Corporation Date Issued 2/13/2023, Answer Due 3/15/2023; Thunder, Inc. Date Issued 2/13/2023, Answer Due 3/15/2023; U.S. Small Business Administration Date Issued 2/13/2023, Answer Due 3/15/2023 (RE: related document(s)#1 AND #3 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) filed by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company) Status hearing to be held on 3/21/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) (Alias) Filed by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert J. Berens in Support Thereof) (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued on B.S.D. Capital, Inc. dba Lendistry Date Issued 2/3/2023, Answer Due 3/6/2023; BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. Date Issued 2/3/2023, Answer Due 3/6/2023; BankDirect Capital Finance Date Issued 2/3/2023, Answer Due 3/6/2023; Century 21 Real Estate LLC Date Issued 2/3/2023, Answer Due 3/6/2023; Franchise Tax Board Date Issued 2/3/2023, Answer Due 3/6/2023; Internal Revenue Service Date Issued 2/3/2023, Answer Due 3/6/2023; PACE Finance Corporation Date Issued 2/3/2023, Answer Due 3/6/2023; Thunder, Inc. Date Issued 2/3/2023, Answer Due 3/6/2023; U.S. Small Business Administration Date Issued 2/3/2023, Answer Due 3/6/2023 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Argonaut Insurance Company) Status hearing to be held on 3/21/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (SF) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketReceipt of Complaint(# 2:23-ap-01076-BR) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A55111594. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:23-ap-01076. Complaint by Argonaut Insurance Company against Thunder, Inc., U.S. Small Business Administration, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., BankDirect Capital Finance, PACE Finance Corporation, B.S.D. Capital, Inc. dba Lendistry, Century 21 Real Estate LLC, Franchise Tax Board, Internal Revenue Service. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" #2 Exhibit "2" #3 Exhibit "3" #4 Exhibit "4" #5 Exhibit "5" #6 Exhibit "6" #7 Exhibit "7" #8 Exhibit "8" #9 Exhibit "9" #10 Exhibit "10" #11 Exhibit "11" #12 Exhibit "12" #13 Exhibit "13" #14 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Berens, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less