Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2020 at 05:18:09 (UTC).

Anna Maria Avilez-Avila

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 Anna Maria Avilez-Avila was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-BK-13369

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Anna Maria Avilez-Avila

San Bernardino, CA 92405

Trustee

Arturo Cisneros (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

William Huestis

4000 Macarthur Blvd. #600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila) (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila) (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#9

(#9) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/16/2020 at 09:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Objections for Discharge due by 08/17/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 08/17/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Huestis, William) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Anna Maria Avilez-Avila (Huestis, William) WARNING: See docket entry no. 8 for corrective action. Case deficient for Statement of Intent (Form 108) due 6/12/2020. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 5/27/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 5/27/2020. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 5/27/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 5/27/2020. Holographic Signature of Debtor(s) on Petition (Official Form 101) due 5/18/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) - Declaration (Signed) due 5/18/2020. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (Signed) (LBR Form F1007-1) due 5/18/2020. All documents were filed but missing holographic signature. Modified on 5/13/2020 (Mason, Shari). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without holographic signature. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila) (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila) (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila) (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila) Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 5/27/2020. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 5/27/2020. (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 5/27/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 5/27/2020. (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/16/2020 at 09:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. Objections for Discharge due by 08/17/2020. Cert. of Financial Management due by 08/17/2020 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Huestis, William) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:20-bk-13369) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 51105974. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Anna Maria Avilez-Avila. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Anna Maria Avilez-Avila (Huestis, William) WARNING: See docket entry no. 8 for corrective action. Case deficient for Statement of Intent (Form 108) due 6/12/2020. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 5/27/2020. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 5/27/2020. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 5/27/2020. Incomplete Filings due by 5/27/2020. Holographic Signature of Debtor(s) on Petition (Official Form 101) due 5/18/2020. Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) - Declaration (Signed) due 5/18/2020. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (Signed) (LBR Form F1007-1) due 5/18/2020. All documents were filed but missing holographic signature. Modified on 5/13/2020 (Mason, Shari). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Huestis