This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/23/2022 at 06:30:30 (UTC).

Ananthalakshmi Subramanian

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Ananthalakshmi Subramanian was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Erik P. Kimball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-BK-14925

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Erik P. Kimball

 

Party Details

Debtor

Ananthalakshmi Subramanian

Jupiter, FL 33458

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Trustee

Tarek Kirk Kiem

Greenacres, FL 33454

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Aaron A Wernick

Attorney at Wernick Law, PLLC

2255 Glades Rd # 324A

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Us Trustee Attorney

Heidi A Feinman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) Order Approving Application to Employ Richard Karpeles and Friedman, Feldmesser & Karpeles, CPA, LLC as Accountants to the Debtor (Re: #34). (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#54

(#54) Order Approving Final Fee Application of Aaron A. Wernick, Esq. and Wernick Law, PLLC, Attorneys for Debtor, Ananthalakshmi Subramanian, for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (Re: #40) for Aaron A Wernick, Fees Awarded: $11900.00, Expenses Awarded: $30.42 (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#53

(#53) Certificate of Service by Attorney Aaron A Wernick (Re: #51 Order on Application to Employ). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#52

(#52) Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem (Re: #50 Order on Application for Compensation). (Kiem, Tarek) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#51

(#51) Order Approving Employment of Aaron A. Wernick and Wernick Law, PLLC as Attorneys for Debtor on a Final Basis (Re: #18). (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#50

(#50) Order Granting Final And Supplemental Fees and Costs to Subchapter V Trustee Tarek Kiem (Re: #38 and #49) Filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem. Fees Awarded: $2750.00, Expenses Awarded: $78.66 (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#40

(#54) Order Approving Final Fee Application of Aaron A. Wernick, Esq. and Wernick Law, PLLC, Attorneys for Debtor, Ananthalakshmi Subramanian, for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (Re: #40) for Aaron A Wernick, Fees Awarded: $11900.00, Expenses Awarded: $30.42 (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#34

(#55) Order Approving Application to Employ Richard Karpeles and Friedman, Feldmesser & Karpeles, CPA, LLC as Accountants to the Debtor (Re: #34). (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#18

(#51) Order Approving Employment of Aaron A. Wernick and Wernick Law, PLLC as Attorneys for Debtor on a Final Basis (Re: #18). (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#9

(#9) Order Authorizing Individual Chapter 11 Debtor(s) to Manage Financial Affairs . (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Deadline to File a Complaint Objecting to Discharge of the Debtor: First date set for hearing on confirmation of plan. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 7/25/2022 at 02:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 9/23/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 9/2/2022. (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Hampton Peterson Esq Filed by Creditor Palm Beach County Tax Collector. (Peterson, Hampton) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

5 #2

Verified Statement

5 #1

Main Document

#7

(#7) Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Aaron A Wernick. (Extracted From ECF #1) (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Filed by Debtor Ananthalakshmi Subramanian. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#3

(#3) Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course by Debtor Filed by Debtor Ananthalakshmi Subramanian. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 09/2/2022. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Order Approving Application to Employ Richard Karpeles and Friedman, Feldmesser & Karpeles, CPA, LLC as Accountants to the Debtor (Re: #34). (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Order Approving Final Fee Application of Aaron A. Wernick, Esq. and Wernick Law, PLLC, Attorneys for Debtor, Ananthalakshmi Subramanian, for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (Re: #40) for Aaron A Wernick, Fees Awarded: $11900.00, Expenses Awarded: $30.42 (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Certificate of Service by Attorney Aaron A Wernick (Re: #51 Order on Application to Employ). (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Certificate of Service Filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem (Re: #50 Order on Application for Compensation). (Kiem, Tarek) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Order Approving Employment of Aaron A. Wernick and Wernick Law, PLLC as Attorneys for Debtor on a Final Basis (Re: #18). (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Order Granting Final And Supplemental Fees and Costs to Subchapter V Trustee Tarek Kiem (Re: #38 and #49) Filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem. Fees Awarded: $2750.00, Expenses Awarded: $78.66 (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Supplement [Resulting in Total Fees $2750.00 and Total Expenses $78.66 for a Total of $2,828.66] Filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem (Re: #38 First and Final Application for Compensation for Tarek Kirk Kiem, Trustee Chapter 9/11, Period: 6/27/2022 to 8/3/2022, Fee: $2350.00, Expenses: $59.09. filed by Trustee Tarek Kirk Kiem). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kiem, Tarek) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Certificate for Confirmation Regarding Payment of Domestic Support Obligations and, if applicable, Filing of Required Tax Returns Filed by Debtor Ananthalakshmi Subramanian. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Confirmation Affidavit for Subchapter V Debtor Filed by Debtor Ananthalakshmi Subramanian. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Certificate of Subchapter V Debtor on Acceptance of Plan, Report on Amount to be Deposited, Certificate of Amount Deposited and Payment of Fees Filed by Debtor Ananthalakshmi Subramanian. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Authorizing Individual Chapter 11 Debtor(s) to Manage Financial Affairs . (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Deadline to File a Complaint Objecting to Discharge of the Debtor: First date set for hearing on confirmation of plan. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 7/25/2022 at 02:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 9/23/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 9/2/2022. (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Hampton Peterson Esq Filed by Creditor Palm Beach County Tax Collector. (Peterson, Hampton) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice Appointing Tarek Kirk Kiem as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement)(Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Aaron A Wernick. (Extracted From ECF #1) (Fleurimond, Lucie) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Filed by Debtor Ananthalakshmi Subramanian. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-14925) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A41067027. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course by Debtor Filed by Debtor Ananthalakshmi Subramanian. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Debtor(s) Social Security Number(s) [Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users] Filed by Debtor Ananthalakshmi Subramanian. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 09/2/2022. (Wernick, Aaron) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heidi Ann Feinman(Designation Retained)