This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/05/2021 at 11:37:40 (UTC).

Anahit Harutyunyan

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Anahit Harutyunyan was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Neil W. Bason and Sandra R. Klein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-11923

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

Judge Details

Judges

Neil W. Bason

Sandra R. Klein

 

Party Details

Debtor

Anahit Harutyunyan

Sunland, CA 91040

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Kathy A Dockery (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Vahe Khojayan

Attorney at YK Law, LLP

445 S. Figueroa Street, Ste 2280

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#57

#56

#55

#54

#58

#53

#52

#51

#50

#45

#24

#10

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

#1

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Proof of service Filed by (RE: related document(s)#54 Notice of intent to pay claims (batch)). (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#52 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/11/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#53 Notice of order confirming chapter 13 plan (BNC)) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 08/11/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Notice of intent to pay claims . (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Notice/Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges Filed by Debtor Anahit Harutyunyan . (Francis, Dawnette) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Notice of order confirming chapter 13 plan (BNC) (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Order Granting Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/9/2021 (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13, #45 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Anahit Harutyunyan). (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#50 Notice of Lodgment of Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Auto)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Notice of lodgment of proposed order confirming chapter 13 plan (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Withdrawal re: Filed by Creditor Fifth Third Bank, National Association (RE: related document(s)#24 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan). (Delmotte, Joseph) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security(CM27). (RE: related document(s)#2 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Anahit Harutyunyan) (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Anahit Harutyunyan Case Number #20-15381, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 06/15/2020 , Dismissed for Other Reason on 03/10/2021.(Admin) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/16/2021 at 09:00 AM at TR 13, VIDEO CONFERENCE. GOTO TRUSTEE WEBSITE FOR INSTRUCTIONS. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/20/2021 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 05/19/2021. (Khojayan, Vahe) CORRECTION: Incorrect Notice Created. Refer To Docket Entry #10. Modified on 3/12/2021 (Milano, Sonny). (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:21-bk-11923) [misc,volp13] ( 313.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 52583381. Fee amount 313.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Anahit Harutyunyan. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Anahit Harutyunyan. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Anahit Harutyunyan. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Anahit Harutyunyan. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Filed by Debtor Anahit Harutyunyan. (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $313 Filed by Anahit Harutyunyan (Khojayan, Vahe) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vahe V Khojayan