This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/10/2022 at 06:19:06 (UTC).

Americore Health, LLC v. Airgas USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 Americore Health, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Airgas USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory R. Schaaf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-AP-06009

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory R. Schaaf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Americore Health, LLC

3933 S Broadway

St Louis, MO 63118

Defendant

Airgas USA, LLC

259 N. Radnor-Chester Road, Suite 100

Radnor, PA 19087

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott E. Prince

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Americore Health, LLC, #2 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

(#4) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#4 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

6 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Exhibit

#7

(#7) Order Scheduling Status Hearing and Vacating the Order for Trial. Status Hearing to be held on 8/18/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf) Modified on 8/15/2022 (alf). Court Note: Docket text was modified to correct document description. View the Notice of Electronic Filing for original docket text. (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#8

(#8) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/18/2022 9:01:12 AM ]. File Size [ 1693 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:03 ]. (admin). (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#9

(#9) Judge's Minutes of Status Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#7 Order Setting Hearing). (alf) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#10

(#10) Order Remanding Status Hearing Order (RE: related document(s)#7 Order Setting Hearing) (alf) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order Remanding Status Hearing Order (RE: related document(s)#7 Order Setting Hearing) (alf) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Judge's Minutes of Status Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#7 Order Setting Hearing). (alf) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/18/2022 9:01:12 AM ]. File Size [ 1693 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:03 ]. (admin). (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Scheduling Status Hearing and Vacating the Order for Trial. Status Hearing to be held on 8/18/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf) Modified on 8/15/2022 (alf). Court Note: Docket text was modified to correct document description. View the Notice of Electronic Filing for original docket text. (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Amended Complaint by Americore Health, LLC against Airgas USA, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Americore Health, LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#4 Order for Trial). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Trial. Trial set for 8/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 2nd Floor. (alf)Attorney for Plaintiff(s) is directed to serve a copy of the Order for Trial on all adverse parties, and further file with the Court a certificate of service. (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Service , filed by Scott E. Prince (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Americore Health, LLC, #2 Summons Issued). (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (alf) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Complaint(# 22-06009-grs) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A11072851, amount $ 350.00. (re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 22-06009. Complaint, filed by Americore Health, LLC against Airgas USA, LLC Fee Amount 350. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Prince, Scott) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Americore Health, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AIRGAS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E. Prince