This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/29/2022 at 06:15:28 (UTC).

Americore Health, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 Americore Health, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory R. Schaaf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-61607

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory R. Schaaf

 

Party Details

Debtor

Americore Health, LLC

3933 S Broadway

St Louis, MO 63118

Trustee

Carol L. Fox

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

100 E Vine St #500

Lexington, KY 40507

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Trustee Attorneys

Robert T Razzano

312 Walnut Street, Suite 3200

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Tiffany Payne Geyer

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S. Orange Avenue, Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Jimmy D. Parrish

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S Orange Ave, Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Elizabeth A. Green

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S Orange Ave, Ste 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Us Trustee Attorney

Bradley M. Nerderman

100 E. Vine St. #500

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

#34

#33

32 #2

Proposed Order

32 #1

Main Document

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#17

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#33 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney). (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Order GRANTING Motion To Withdraw As Attorney (Related Doc #32). Involvement of Attorney Melissa R. Dixon terminated. (awd) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Melissa R. Dixon. Last day to file objections: 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/09/2020. (Related Doc #30) (Admin.) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Notice of Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors Filed by U.S. Trustee (RE: related document(s) 26 Meeting of Creditors Continued by Trustee). Telephonic 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/30/2020 at 02:00 PM. (Nerderman, Bradley) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/15/2020. (Related Doc #28) (Admin.) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice is hereby given all Section 341 meetings and certain confirmation hearings previously scheduled by the United States Bankruptcy Court to be held in the Eastern District of Kentucky on March 16, 2020 through April 3, 2020, are being rescheduled for a date and time to be determined. Specific notice rescheduling these matters will be provided to parties at a later date. (awd) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, filed by Carol L. Fox. (Geyer, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#26) Meeting of Creditors Continued by Trustee. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/19/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Trustee Hearing Room 529, Lexington. (Nerderman, Bradley)Pursuant to KYEB LBR 2003-1(a), any required service of the continued meeting date, time and place shall be the responsibility of counsel for the debtor(s). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCarol L. Fox, Trustee added to case (awd) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Melissa R. Dixon Filed by on behalf of Paula Downey, Daniel Glenn Jones. (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 01/02/2020. (Related Doc #4) (Admin.) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Directing US Trustee to Appoint patient care Ombudsman. Appointment of ombudsman due by 1/21/2020 (alf) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order to File List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims. Document due by 1/7/2020. (alf) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Chapter 11 Operating Order. (alf) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order to File Proposed Order Designating Corporate Representative, Schedules A,B, D-H, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individuals Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. (alf) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Docket(#3) Deficiency - Action RequiredA petition having been filed in this case, and the court finding that creditors were not uploaded into the CM/ECF system, It is ORDERED that counsel for the debtor(s) shall upload the creditor matrix file by docketing Bankruptcy - Creditor Maintenance within 3 working days from the date of this order. /s/ Judge Gregory R. Schaaf. (alf)This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bradley M. Nerderman Filed by on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Nerderman, Bradley) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(19-61607) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 10193154, amount $1717.00. (re: Doc #1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount 1717 Filed by Americore Health, LLC. (Irving, James) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Americore Health, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley M. Nerderman