This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/15/2022 at 06:32:11 (UTC).

American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is J Kate Stickles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-10028

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

J Kate Stickles

 

Party Details

Debtor

American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC

3819 Hawk Crest Road

Ann Arbor, MI 48103

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building

844 King Street, SU 2207

Not Classified By Court

Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC

777 Third Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Shanti M. Katona

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1101

Wilmington, DE 19801

Tanya Behnam

Attorney at Polsinelli LLP

2049 Century Park E, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David E. Gordon

Attorney at Polsinelli, PC

1201 West Peachtree Street Nw, Suite 1100

Atlanta, GA 30309

Caryn Wang

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1201 West Peachtree St. Nw, Suite 1100

Alanta, GA 30309

Us Trustee Attorney

Joseph James McMahon, Jr.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox #35

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#240

(#240) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#238) Filed by Suzanne Koenig. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

239 #2

Exhibit A

239 #1

Main Document

#238

(#238) Notice of Patient Care Ombudsman's Report. Filed by Suzanne Koenig. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#236

(#236) Notice of Certificate/Affidavit of Publication - USA Today (Notice of Confirmation Hearing). Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#235

(#235) Notice of Certificate/Affidavit of Publication - USA Today (Notice of Bar Date). Filed by American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#234

(#234) Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Angharad Bowdler. Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#233

(#233) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order (I) Approving Designation of the Stalking Horse Purchaser and (II) Approving Bid Protections. Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (related document(s)#228) (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#232

(#232) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 8, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. (ET). Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (related document(s)#226) (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#231

(#231) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 8, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. (ET); and Notice to Counterparties to Potentially Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Regarding Cure Amounts and Possible Assignment to the Stalking Horse Purchaser or Such Other Successful Bidder at Auction. Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (related document(s)#222, #223) (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#200

No Description Available

#199

No Description Available

#198

No Description Available

#197

No Description Available

#196

No Description Available

#195

No Description Available

#194

No Description Available

270 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#240) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#238) Filed by Suzanne Koenig. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#239) Affidavit of Posting Notice of Patient Care Ombudsman's Initial Report (related document(s)#238) Filed by Suzanne Koenig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#238) Notice of Patient Care Ombudsman's Report. Filed by Suzanne Koenig. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • Docket(#237) Minute Sheet 341 Meeting Held and Concluded on 3/14/22 Filed by U.S. Trustee. (McMahon, Joseph) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#236) Notice of Certificate/Affidavit of Publication - USA Today (Notice of Confirmation Hearing). Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#235) Notice of Certificate/Affidavit of Publication - USA Today (Notice of Bar Date). Filed by American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#234) Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Angharad Bowdler. Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#233) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Order (I) Approving Designation of the Stalking Horse Purchaser and (II) Approving Bid Protections. Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (related document(s)#228) (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#232) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 8, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. (ET). Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (related document(s)#226) (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 8, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. (ET); and Notice to Counterparties to Potentially Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Regarding Cure Amounts and Possible Assignment to the Stalking Horse Purchaser or Such Other Successful Bidder at Auction. Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC. (related document(s)#222, #223) (Gallerie, Bridget) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
223 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Maintain and Administer Their Refund Program and Practices, and (II) Honor Obligations Related Thereto Filed By American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions / Motion of Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Continuation of, and Payment of Prepetition Obligations Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business in Connection with Various Insurance Policies, (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto, (III) Preventing Insurance Companies from Giving Any Notice of Termination or Otherwise Modifying Any Insurance Policy Without Obtaining Relief From the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue to Honor Installment Plan and Brokerage Obligations Filed By American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Pay Employee Wages Filed By American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts Filed By American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion / Declaration of Todd Topliff, President of the Debtors, in Support of Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Pleadings Filed By American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-10028) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10613317, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketJudge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketFiled by U.S. Trustee. (McMahon, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 02/14/2022 (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph James McMahon, Jr.