This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/15/2022 at 06:32:43 (UTC).

American Eagle Brandon LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 American Eagle Brandon LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is J Kate Stickles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-10032

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

J Kate Stickles

 

Party Details

Debtor

American Eagle Brandon LLC

700 S Kings Avenue

Brandon, FL 33511

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building

844 King Street, SU 2207

Not Classified By Court

Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC

777 Third Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Shanti M. Katona

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1101

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by American Eagle Brandon LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 02/14/2022 (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Order Directing Joint Administration An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC, Case No. 22-10028 (JKS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 1/18/2022 (AJL) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

5 #1

Main Document

5 #2

Statement of Financial Affairs

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by American Eagle Brandon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Financial Affairs) (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Directing Joint Administration An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC, Case No. 22-10028 (JKS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 1/18/2022 (AJL) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by American Eagle Delaware Holding Company LLC. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-10032) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10613317, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketJudge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by American Eagle Brandon LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 02/14/2022 (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shanti M. Katona