Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/20/2021 at 23:00:18 (UTC).

American Addiction Centers, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2020 American Addiction Centers, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judges overseeing this case are John T. Dorsey and Craig T. Goldblatt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-BK-11635

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judges

John T. Dorsey

Craig T. Goldblatt

 

Party Details

Debtor

American Addiction Centers, Inc.

200 Powell Place

Brentwood, TN 37027

Not Classified By Court

Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc.

6201 15Th Avenue

Brooklyn, NY 11219

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Dennis A. Meloro

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

The Nemours Building, 1007 North Orange Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge John T. Dorsey Terminated (SH) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#6

(#6) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by American Addiction Centers, Inc.. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#5

(#5) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by American Addiction Centers, Inc.. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Authorizing and Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only. An order (the "Joint Administration Order") has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases listed below under Case No. 20-11648. The docket in Case No. 20-11648 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: Case No. 20-11606; Case No. 20-11607; Case No. 20-11608; Case No. 20-11609; Case No. 20-11610; Case No. 20-11611; Case No. 20-11612; Case No. 20-11613; Case No. 20-11614; Case No. 20-11615; Case No. 20-11616; Case No. 20-11617; Case No. 20-11618; Case No. 20-11619; Case No. 20-11620; Case No. 20-11621; Case No. 20-11622; Case No. 20-11623; Case No. 20-11624; Case No. 20-11625; Case No. 20-11626; Case No. 20-11627; Case No. 20-11628; Case No. 20-11629; Case No. 20-11630; Case No. 20-11631; Case No. 20-11632; Case No. 20-11633; Case No. 20-11634; Case No. 20-11635; Case No. 20-11636; Case No. 20-11637; Case No. 20-11638; Case No. 20-11639; Case No. 20-11640; Case No. 20-11641; Case No. 20-11642; Case No. 20-11643; Case No. 20-11644; Case No. 20-11645; Case No. 20-11646; Case No. 20-11647; Case No. 20-11648; Case No. 20-11649; Case No. 20-11650; Case No. 20-11651; Case No. 20-11652; and Case No. 20-11653; and Case No. 20-11654. Signed on 6/23/2020. (RC) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Synchrony Bank. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 06/21/2020)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by American Addiction Centers, Inc.. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 07/20/2020 (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 06/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Craig Todd Goldblatt added to case. Involvement of Judge John T. Dorsey Terminated (SH) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by American Addiction Centers, Inc.. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by American Addiction Centers, Inc.. (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Authorizing and Directing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only. An order (the "Joint Administration Order") has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases listed below under Case No. 20-11648. The docket in Case No. 20-11648 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: Case No. 20-11606; Case No. 20-11607; Case No. 20-11608; Case No. 20-11609; Case No. 20-11610; Case No. 20-11611; Case No. 20-11612; Case No. 20-11613; Case No. 20-11614; Case No. 20-11615; Case No. 20-11616; Case No. 20-11617; Case No. 20-11618; Case No. 20-11619; Case No. 20-11620; Case No. 20-11621; Case No. 20-11622; Case No. 20-11623; Case No. 20-11624; Case No. 20-11625; Case No. 20-11626; Case No. 20-11627; Case No. 20-11628; Case No. 20-11629; Case No. 20-11630; Case No. 20-11631; Case No. 20-11632; Case No. 20-11633; Case No. 20-11634; Case No. 20-11635; Case No. 20-11636; Case No. 20-11637; Case No. 20-11638; Case No. 20-11639; Case No. 20-11640; Case No. 20-11641; Case No. 20-11642; Case No. 20-11643; Case No. 20-11644; Case No. 20-11645; Case No. 20-11646; Case No. 20-11647; Case No. 20-11648; Case No. 20-11649; Case No. 20-11650; Case No. 20-11651; Case No. 20-11652; and Case No. 20-11653; and Case No. 20-11654. Signed on 6/23/2020. (RC) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-11635) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9838962, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Synchrony Bank. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 06/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2020
  • DocketJudge John T. Dorsey added to case (BA) (Entered: 06/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by American Addiction Centers, Inc.. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 07/20/2020 (Meloro, Dennis) (Entered: 06/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Donlin, Recano & Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where American Addiction Centers, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis A. Meloro