This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/30/2021 at 06:30:46 (UTC).

Alpha Latam Management, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/01/2021 Alpha Latam Management, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is J Kate Stickles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-11109

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

J Kate Stickles

 

Party Details

Debtor

Alpha Latam Management, LLC

78 Sw 7Th Street

Miami, FL 33130

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building

844 King Street, SU 2207

Not Classified By Court

Prime Clerk LLC

One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10165

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Philip M. Abelson

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1095

Brett Bakemeyer

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1095

Ashley Bowron

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Mark D. Collins

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

John K Cunningham

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131

Richard S. Kebrdle

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131

Megan Kenney

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

John Henry Knight

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Lilian M. Marques

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

J. Zachary Noble

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Amanda A Parra Criste

Attorney at White & Case LLP

200 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4900

Miami, FL 33131

John J. Ramirez

Attorney at White & Case LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020-1095

Devin J. Rivero

Attorney at White & Case LLP

Miami, Fl 33131

Miami, FL 33131

Brendan Joseph Schlauch

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.

One Rodney Square, 920 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jason N. Zakia

Attorney at White & Case LLP

111 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 60606

Andrew T Zatz

Attorney at White & Case, LLP

1155 Avenue Of Americas

New York, NY 10036

Us Trustee Attorney

Linda Richenderfer

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

844 King Street, Suite 2207

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Benjamin Joseph Steele

Attorney at Prime Clerk LLC

One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10165

 

Court Documents

231 #4

Exhibit B

231 #3

Exhibit A

231 #2

Notice

231 #1

Main Document

#213

210 #2

Exhibit A

209 #4

Exhibit B

209 #3

Exhibit A

209 #2

Notice

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

#3

#1

396 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#231) Application for Compensation First Monthly Fee Application of AlixPartners, LLP, Financial Advisor to the Chapter 11 Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period August 2, 2021 to August 31, 2021 Filed by AlixPartners, LLP. Objections due by 10/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B) (Noble, J.) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#230) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Geoffrey Parnon Regarding Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving Entry into Stalking Horse Agreement and Related Bid Protections in Connection with the Sale of All or Substantially All of Certain of the Debtors' Assets, (II) Modifying Bidding Procedures, and (III) Granting Related Relief, Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Shortening the Notice and Objection Periods for, and Scheduling an Expedited Hearing on, the Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving Entry into Stalking Horse Agreement and Related Bid Protections in Connection with the Sale of All or Substantially All of Certain of the Debtors' Assets, (II) Modifying Bidding Procedures, and (III) Granting Related Relief, Declaration of Victor Leclercq in Support of the Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving Entry into Stalking Horse Agreement and Related Bid Protections in Connection with the Sale of All or Substantially All of Certain of the Debtors' Assets, (II) Modifying Bidding Procedures, and (III) Granting Related Relief, Order Shortening the Notice and Objections Periods, and Notice of Hearing. Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (related document(s)#209, #210, #211, #213, #215) (Malo, David) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#229) Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Alpha Latam Management, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/1/2021 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#228) Motion to Establish Deadline to File Proofs of Claim (Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Establishing Bar Dates, (B) Establishing Procedures for Filing Proofs of Claim and Asserting Refund Claims, and (C) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof). Filed by Alpha Latam Management, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A) (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#227) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Geoffrey Parnon Regarding Declaration in Support of Employment of KPMG Advisory Tax & Legal SAS as Professional Utilized in Ordinary Course of Business. Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (related document(s)#217) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#226) Motion to Authorize (Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing and Approving Expedited Procedures for the (I) Sale or Abandonment of De Minimis Assets and (II) Assumption and Assignment or Rejection of De Minimis Agreements) Filed by Alpha Latam Management, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A) (Noble, J.) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#225) Exhibit(s) //Notice of Filing of Form of Stalking Horse APA (related document(s)#113, #198, #209, #213, #215) Filed by Alpha Latam Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#224) Supplemental Declaration (Second) of Lawrence Young of AlixPartners, LLP (related document(s)#118, #186) Filed by Alpha Latam Management, LLC. (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#223) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Natasha Otton Regarding Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for Establishment of Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Chapter 11 Professionals and Committee Members (If Any), Certification of Counsel Regarding Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing and Granting Liens and Superpriority Administrative Claims and (II) Granting Related Relief, Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing and Granting Liens and Superpriority Administrative Claims, and (II) Granting Related Relief, Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Chapter 11 Professionals and Committee Members, Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Amended Agenda for Video Hearing Scheduled for September 13, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time), Before the Honorable J. Kate Stickles, at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, and Notice of Agenda for Video Hearing Scheduled for September 15, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time), Before the Honorable J. Kate Stickles, at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware. Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (related document(s)#170, #173, #177, #178, #179, #180) (Malo, David) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#222) Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Geoffrey Parnon Regarding Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving Entry into Stalking Horse Agreement and Related Bid Protections in Connection with the Sale of All or Substantially All of Certain of the Debtors' Assets, (II) Modifying Bidding Procedures, and (III) Granting Related Relief, Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Shortening the Notice and Objection Periods for, and Scheduling an Expedited Hearing on, the Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving Entry into Stalking Horse Agreement and Related Bid Protections in Connection with the Sale of All or Substantially All of Certain of the Debtors' Assets, (II) Modifying Bidding Procedures, and (III) Granting Related Relief, and Declaration of Victor Leclercq in Support of the Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving Entry into Stalking Horse Agreement and Related Bid Protections in Connection with the Sale of All or Substantially All of Certain of the Debtors' Assets, (II) Modifying Bidding Procedures, and (III) Granting Related Relief. Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (related document(s)#209, #210, #211) (Malo, David) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
215 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims //Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors, Foreign Vendors, and Customers Filed By Alpha Latam Management, LLC (Kenney, Megan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Pay Sales and Use Taxes // Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees and Granting Related Relief Filed By Alpha Latam Management, LLC (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions //Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Interim and Final Order: (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Maintain Existing Insurance Policies and Pay All Insurance Obligations Arising Thereunder and (B) Renew, Revise, Extend, Supplement, Change, or Enter Into New Insurance Policies; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alpha Latam Management, LLC (Kenney, Megan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Pay Employee Wages // Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders: (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages and Other Employee Obligations and (B) Maintain Employee Benefit Programs and Pay Related Administrative Obligations; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alpha Latam Management, LLC (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions //Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order: (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated Creditor Matrix in Lieu of Submitting a Separate Creditor Matrix for Each Debtor, Waiving Certain Creditor Matrix Requirements; (B) File a Consolidated List of Top 30 Unsecured Creditors; (C) Redact Certain Personal Identification Information, and (D) Establish Procedures for Notifying Parties of the Commencement of These Cases; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alpha Latam Management, LLC (Kenney, Megan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions // Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order (I) Confirming, Restating, and Enforcing the Worldwide Automatic Stay, Anti-Discrimination Provisions, and Ipso Facto Protections of the Bankruptcy Code, (II) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alpha Latam Management, LLC (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Alpha Latam Management, LLC. (Kenney, Megan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Acsa Atento S.A.S., Alpha Capital S.A.S., Alpha Latam Management, LLC, AlphaCredit Latam S.A.S., AlphaCredit Sudamerica, S. de R.L., AlphaDebit, S.A. de C.V., Vive Creditos Kusida S.A.S.. (Knight, John) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent PRIME CLERK LLC Filed By Alpha Latam Management, LLC (Schlauch, Brendan) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Alpha Latam Management, LLC. (Collins, Mark) (Entered: 08/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where Prime Clerk LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Joseph Steele