This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 12/25/2020 at 06:32:24 (UTC).

Alfredo Bala and Johana Gil

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Alfredo Bala and Johana Gil was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Eastern Bankruptcy . The Judge overseeing this case is Brenda T. Rhoades. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-BK-42178

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Brenda T. Rhoades

 

Party Details

Debtors

Johana Gil

Flower Mound, TX 75022

Alfredo Bala

Flower Mound, TX 75022

Us Trustee

US Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Eric A. Liepins

12770 Coit Road, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75251

Us Trustee Attorney

Timothy W. O'Neal

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

110 N. College Ave., Suite 300

Tyler, TX 75702

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#16

#15

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Operating Report for Filing Period 11/1/2020 to 11/30/2020 Filed by Alfredo Bala, Johana Gil (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Withdrawal of Claim in the amount of $2280.05 Claim Number 8 Filed by American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. (Bharatia, Shraddha) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Personal Financial Management Course Certificate For Joint Debtor Johana Gil Provided by Sage Personal Finance, 1-800-516-2759 (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Personal Financial Management Course Certificate For Debtor Alfredo Bala Provided by Sage Personal Finance, 1-800-516-2759 (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Original***Declaration for Electronic Filing In Re: (RE: related document(s)#24 Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Alfredo Bala, Johana Gil (RE: related document(s)#23 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule A/B, Amendment: Filed by Alfredo Bala, Johana Gil Document Due 12/8/2020. filed by Debtor Alfredo Bala, Joint Debtor Johana Gil). filed by Debtor Alfredo Bala, Joint Debtor Johana Gil). (pr) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Amended Schedules and/or Amended Matrix(# 20-42178) [misc,amdscall] ( 32.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11856046, amount $ 32.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Declaration for Electronic Filing. Filing of this declaration constitutes a certification by the debtors attorney that: (1) the attorney is in possession of, at a minimum, an electronic or facsimile transmission version of the signed declaration; (2) the attorney has instructed the debtor to forward the originally signed declaration [i.e., with a wet signature] promptly to the attorney; (3) the attorney will forward the originally signed declaration to the Court upon receipt; and (4) the attorney has advised the debtor that any failure to file with the court the originally signed declaration could result in the dismissal of the case. Filed by Alfredo Bala, Johana Gil (RE: related document(s)#23 Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule A/B, Amendment: Filed by Alfredo Bala, Johana Gil Document Due 12/8/2020. filed by Debtor Alfredo Bala, Joint Debtor Johana Gil). (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Amended Schedules Filed: Schedule A/B, Amendment: Filed by Alfredo Bala, Johana Gil Document Due 12/8/2020. (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#21 Notice of Missing Documents (Financial Management Certificate) to Individual Debtor (adi)). Notice Date 11/29/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Missing Documents (Financial Management Certificate) to Individual Debtor (adi) (Entered: 11/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Tara LeDay) Filed by Denton County (LeDay, Tara) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Notices Filed by PRA Receivables Management, LLC (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Johana Gil (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Alfredo Bala (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Meeting of Creditors - Telephone Instructions for 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2020 at 09:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. (kms) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting Of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/20/2020 at 09:30 AM at Telephonic Hearing-See Instructions. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 1/19/2021. Proofs of Claims due by 2/23/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 4/26/2021. (kms) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Missing Documents and Notice that Case May Be Dismissed if Documents are Not Filed. Missing Documents Due By: 11/9/2020. (kms) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Employ Eric Liepins Filed by Alfredo Bala, Johana Gil (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Service List) (Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 20-42178) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11810441, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements, or Other Required Documents. Filed by Alfredo Bala, Johana Gil, Document Due 11/2/2020.(Liepins, Eric) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy W. O'Neal