This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 21:16:51 (UTC).

Alex and Ani, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Alex and Ani, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig T Goldblatt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-10918

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Craig T Goldblatt

 

Party Details

Debtors

Alex

Ani, LLC

Alex and Ani, LLC

10 Briggs Drive

East Greenwich, RI 02818

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court

Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC

222 N. Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 300

El Segundo, CA 90245

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Alexandra Schwarzman

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Allyson Smith

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Joshua A Sussberg

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Sally E. Veghte

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP

919 North Market Street, Suite 1000

Wilmington, DE 19801

Morton R. Branzburg

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP

1835 Market Street, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Gavin Campbell

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nitzan Halperin

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

David I. Horowitz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lara Luo

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Domenic E. Pacitti

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP

919 Market Street, Suite 1000

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael W. Yurkewicz

Attorney at Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP

919 Market St., Suite 1000

Wilmington, DE 19801

Us Trustee Attorney

David L. Buchbinder

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, Suite 2207

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Albert Kass

Attorney at Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC

222 N Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 300

El Segundo, CA 90245

Seth Van Aalten

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C

1325 Avenue Of The Americas, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Justin R. Alberto

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Sarah A. Carnes

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C.

1325 Avenue Of The Americas, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Andrew John Roth-Moore

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C.

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Peter J Strom

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C

1325 Avenue Of The Americas, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Michael Trentin

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C.

25 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#368

(#368) Notice of Withdrawal of of Docket Item Entered in Error (related document(s)#364) Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#365

(#365) Disclosure Statement [SOLICITATION VERSION] Disclosure Statement for the First Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization of Alex and Ani, LLC and Its Debtor Affiliates Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Court (related document(s)#364) Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#364

(#364) [WITHDRAWN - See Docket No. 368] Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization [SOLICITATION VERSION] First Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization of Alex and Ani, LLC and Its Debtor Affiliates Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Court Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC (Pacitti, Domenic) Modified on 8/24/2021 (MD). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

352 #2

Exhibit

352 #1

Main Document

#328

(#370) Notice of Service Notice of Correction to Typographical Errors in Disclosure Statement and Class 3, Class 4 and Class 5 Ballots (related document(s)#49, #328, #352, #365, #369) Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#319

(#363) Certificate of Service re: Documents Served on August 18, 2021 (related document(s)#318, #319, #320, #321, #322, #323, #324, #325) Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

49 #2

Exhibit A

49 #1

Main Document

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit B

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Exhibit A

4 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Main Document

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

627 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • Docket(#371) Transcript regarding Hearing Held 08/20/2021 RE: Disclosure Statement. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/22/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable Companies, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/31/2021. Redaction Request Due By 9/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/24/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/22/2021. (FMo) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#370) Notice of Service Notice of Correction to Typographical Errors in Disclosure Statement and Class 3, Class 4 and Class 5 Ballots (related document(s)#49, #328, #352, #365, #369) Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#369) Amended Chapter 11 Plan [SOLICITATION VERSION] First Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization of Alex and Ani, LLC and Its Debtor Affiliates Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Court (related document(s)#319) Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#368) Notice of Withdrawal of of Docket Item Entered in Error (related document(s)#364) Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#367) HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#366) Notice of Hearing on Motion to Extend the General Bar Date (related document(s)#346) Filed by Kelly Witsen, Shannon Person, Jaime Howard. Hearing scheduled for 9/22/2021 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/7/2021. (Brogan, Daniel) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#365) Disclosure Statement [SOLICITATION VERSION] Disclosure Statement for the First Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization of Alex and Ani, LLC and Its Debtor Affiliates Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Court (related document(s)#364) Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#364) [WITHDRAWN - See Docket No. 368] Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization [SOLICITATION VERSION] First Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization of Alex and Ani, LLC and Its Debtor Affiliates Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Court Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC (Pacitti, Domenic) Modified on 8/24/2021 (MD). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#363) Certificate of Service re: Documents Served on August 18, 2021 (related document(s)#318, #319, #320, #321, #322, #323, #324, #325) Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#362) Supplemental Certificate of Service re: Notice of Dates by Which Parties Must File Proofs of Claim and Administrative Expense Requests and Procedures for Filing Proofs of Claim, Including Claims Under 11 U.S.C. 503(b)(9), and Administrative Expense Requests Against the Debtors; 2) Official Form 410 Proof of Claim; and 3) Notice to Contract Parties to Potentially Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (related document(s)#208, #257, #265, #271) Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
357 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Shippers, Critical Vendors, and 503(b)9) Claimants and Granting Related Relief Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion to Continue Customer Programs Debtors' Motion Seeking Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Maintain and Administer their Existing Customer Programs and Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alex and Ani, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B)(Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Debtors to (A) Pay Their Obligations Under Insurance Policies Entered Into Prepetition, (B) Continue to Pay Brokerage Fees, (C) Renew, Supplement, Modify, or Purchase Insurance Coverage, and (D) Honor the Terms of the Financing Agreements and Pay Premiums Thereunder, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Interim and Final Order (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Payment of Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alex and Ani, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C)(Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Pay Employee Wages Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Employee Wages, Salaries and Other Compensation, and Reimbursable Employee Expenses and (B) Continue Employee Benefit Programs and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alex and Ani, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B)(Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent KURTZMAN CARSON CONSULTANTS, LLC Filed By Alex and Ani, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C)(Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting a Separate Mailing Matrix for Each Debtor, (B) File Consolidated List of the Debtors' Thirty Largest Unsecured Creditors, and (C) Redact Certain Personally Identifiable Information, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by A and A Shareholding, Co., LLC, Alex and Ani Assembly, LLC, Alex and Ani California, LLC, Alex and Ani Canada, LLC, Alex and Ani International, LLC, Alex and Ani Puerto Rico, LLC, Alex and Ani Retail, LLC, Alex and Ani South Seas, LLC, Alex and Ani, LLC. (Yurkewicz, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-10918) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10363368, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Alex and Ani, LLC. (Pacitti, Domenic) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where , ALEX is a litigant

Latest cases where ALEX AND ANI, LLC., a Rhode Island LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant