This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2020 at 06:32:24 (UTC).

Aldrich Pump LLC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Aldrich Pump LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, North Carolina Western Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Craig Whitley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-BK-30608

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

J. Craig Whitley

 

Party Details

Debtor

Aldrich Pump LLC

800-E Beaty Street

Davidson, NC 28036

Interested Parties

The Travelers Indemnity Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company

Hudson Insurance Company

525 N. Tryon Street, Suite 700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company f/k/a The Aetna Casualty and Surety Company

United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company

Evanston Insurance Company [as successor by merger to Associated Internatioal Insurance Company]

525 N. Tryon Street, Suite 700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Employers Mutual Insurance Company

212 S. Gale Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

St. Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Dairyland Insurance Company

926 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

Trane U.S. Inc.

TIG Insurance Company (for itself and as successor by merger to Mt. McKinley Insurance Company (formerly known as Gibraltar Casualty Company

525 N. Tryon Street, Suite 700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Certain London Market Companies

Shrader & Associates

9 Greenway Plaza, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77046

Honeywell International Inc.

St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company

Bestwall LLC

100 Peachtree Street, N.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Everest Reinsurance Copmany (formerly known as Prudential Reinsurance Company)

Charlotte, NC 28202

Not Classified By Court

The Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

John R. Miller, Jr.

Attorney at RAYBURN COOPER & DURHAM, P.A.

1200 The Carillon, 227 West Trade Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

C. Michael Evert, Jr.

Attorney at Evert Weathersby Houff

3455 Peachtree Road, Ne, Suite 1550

Atlanta, GA 30326

Gregory M. Gordon

2727 North Harwood Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75201

David S. Torborg

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A.

1200 Carillon, 227 W. Trade Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Matthew L Tomsic

Attorney at Rayburn Cooper Durham P.A.

227 West Trade St., Suite 1200

Charlotte, NC 28202

Ross Robert Fulton

Attorney at Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A.

227 West Trade Street, Suite 1200

Charlotte, NC 28202

Brad B. Erens

77 West Wacker

Chicago, IL 60601

Mark A. Cody

Attorney at Jones Day

77 West Wacker, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60601

Genna Ghaul

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Interested Party Attorneys

Joshua R Taylor

Attorney at Steptoe Johnson LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue Nw, Washington, Dc

Washington, DC 20036

Russell W. Roten

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

865 S. Figueroa St. Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Phillip S. Pavlick

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Gregory Joseph Mascitti

Attorney at McCarter & English, LLP

825 Eighth Avenue, Ste 31St Floor

New York, NY 10019

Christopher J Culp

Attorney at Touchstone Family Law

P.O. Box 11526

Charlotte, NC 28220

Jason L. Walters

Attorney at Davis Hamrick LLP

P.O.Drawer 20039

Winston-Salem, NC 27120

Richard A. Schneider

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Davis Lee Wright

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

1201 North Market Street, Suite 1406

Wilmington, DE 19801

Glenn C. Thompson

Attorney at Hamilton Stephens Steele & Martin

525 North Tryon Street, Suite 1400

Charlotte, NC 28202

David Neier

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 101664193

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

248 #1

Main Document

#234

No Description Available

#200

No Description Available

#187

No Description Available

#185

No Description Available

#179

No Description Available

#174

No Description Available

#172

No Description Available

#163

No Description Available

#160

No Description Available

#151

No Description Available

#87

No Description Available

#85

No Description Available

#83

No Description Available

#74

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#2

(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

254 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#254) BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: related document(s)#242 Order to Show Cause). No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#253) Certificate of Service (RE: related document(s)#236 Other Document filed by Debtor Aldrich Pump LLC) filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#252) Declaration of Ordinary Course Professional Christopher Shea Goodwin, AAL, LLLC (RE: related document(s)#170 Order (other)) filed by Matthew L Tomsic on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Tomsic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#251) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Carrie V. Hardman on behalf of The Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants. (Hardman, Carrie) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#250) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by David Neier on behalf of The Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants. (Neier, David) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Appear Pro Hac Vice(# 20-30608) [motion,mprohac] ( 281.00). Receipt number A8873269, amount $ 281.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Appear Pro Hac Vice(# 20-30608) [motion,mprohac] ( 281.00). Receipt number A8873269, amount $ 281.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Appear Pro Hac Vice(# 20-30608) [motion,mprohac] ( 281.00). Receipt number A8873269, amount $ 281.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Appear Pro Hac Vice(# 20-30608) [motion,mprohac] ( 281.00). Receipt number A8873269, amount $ 281.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#249) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Richard Mancino (Fee Amount $ 281) filed by Lisa P. Sumner on behalf of Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, Zurich Reinsurance Company, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sumner, Lisa) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
252 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion of the Debtors for an Order (I) Approving the Continued Use of Their Bank Accounts, Cash Management System, and Business Forms; (II) Granting a Waiver of the Requirements of Section 345(b) of the Bankruptcy Code; and (III) Authorizing the Debtors' Banks to Charge Certain Fees and Other Amounts filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Establishing Certain Notice, Case Management, and Administrative Procedures filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion of the Debtors for an Order: (I) Authorizing the Filing of (A) Consolidated Master List of Creditors and (B) Consolidated List of 20 Law Firms with Significant Asbestos Cases Against the Debtors in Lieu of Lists of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors; (II) Approving Certain Notice Procedures for Asbestos Claimants; and (III) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice of Commencement of These Cases filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application w/Affidavit to Employ Professional Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC as Claims, Noticing, and Ballot Agent filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Brief Informational Brief of Aldrich Pump LLC and Murray Boiler LLC filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11(# 20-30608) [misc,volp11] (1717.00). Receipt number A8831105, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Ex Parte Motion of the Debtors for an Order Suspending Entry and Service of Standard Notice of Commencement filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion to Jointly Administer Cases filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement filed by John R. Miller Jr. on behalf of Aldrich Pump LLC. (Miller, John) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition Under Chapter 11 - Filing Fee Amount $ 1717 (Miller, John) Modified on 6/18/2020 (tes). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Document filed on fillable form and restricted. SEE DOCUMENT #47 FOR CORRECT ENTRY. (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CERTAIN LONDON MARKET COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Bestwall LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALDRICH PUMP, LLC is a litigant