This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/21/2019 at 05:10:20 (UTC).

Alan Curtis Taylor and Sharon Bernice Taylor

Case Summary

On 06/20/2019 Alan Curtis Taylor and Sharon Bernice Taylor was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-BK-15388

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtors

Alan Curtis Taylor

Temecula, CA 92592

Sharon Bernice Taylor

Temecula, CA 92592

Trustee

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Daniel Joseph Lickel

Attorney at Law Offices of Daniel Lickel

3533 Fairmount Ave

San Diego, CA 92105

 

Court Documents

#13

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#12

(#12) Signature of Attorney on Petition (Official Form 101 or 201) of Attorney with Holographic Signatures of Debtors Filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor. (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#10

(#10) Chapter 13 procedures order Re: (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/20/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor). (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor) (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor) (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#9

(#9) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/31/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/07/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 08/29/2019. (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor. (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Case Upload) filed by Daniel Lickel of Rooney & Lickel Attorneys at Law on behalf of Alan Curtis Taylor, Sharon Bernice Taylor. (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount filed by Daniel Lickel of Rooney & Lickel Attorneys at Law on behalf of Alan Curtis Taylor, Sharon Bernice Taylor. (Lickel, Daniel) WARNING: See docket entries #5, #6, #7, and #8 for corrective actions. Case deficient for Voluntary Petition(missing holographic signatures), due 6/24/19. Statement of Social Security (missing holographic signatures), due 6/24/19. Verification of master mailing list(missing holographic signature), 6/24/19. StmtRelatedCases (LBR F1015-2) , due 7/5/19. Summary(Form 106Sum or 206Sum), due 7/5/19. Schd A/B(Form106A/B or 206A/B), due 7/5/19. Schedule C (Form 106C),due 7/5/19. Schedule D (Form 106D or 206D), due 7/5/19. Schd E/F(Form106E/F or 206E/F), due 7/5/19. Schedule G (Form 106G or 206G), due 7/5/19. Schedule H (Form 106H or 206H), due 7/5/19. Schedule I (Form 106I), due 7/5/19. Schedule J (Form 106J), due 7/5/19. Decl Re Sched (Form 106Dec), due 7/5/19. StmtFinAffairs(Form107 or 207), due 7/5/19. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1), due 7/5/19. Means Calculation(Form 122C-2), due 7/5/19. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1), due 7/5/19. Dcl Db Emp Income(LBR F1002-1), due 7/5/19. Modified on 6/20/2019 (Lozano, Tanisha). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload). (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Signature of Attorney on Petition (Official Form 101 or 201) of Attorney with Holographic Signatures of Debtors Filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor. (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • (#11) Hearing Set Status Conference hearing to be held on 7/31/2019 at 03:30 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Chapter 13 procedures order Re: (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/20/2019 (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor). (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor) (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor) (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor) (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor) Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 7/5/2019. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 7/5/2019. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 7/5/2019. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 7/5/2019. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 7/5/2019. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 7/5/2019. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 7/5/2019. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 7/5/2019. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 7/5/2019. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 7/5/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 7/5/2019. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 7/5/2019. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 7/5/2019. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 7/5/2019. (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor) Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 7/5/2019. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 7/5/2019. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 7/5/2019. Incomplete Filings due by 7/5/2019. (Lozano, Tanisha) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/31/2019 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/07/2019 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 08/29/2019. (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor. (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Alan Curtis Taylor, Joint Debtor Sharon Bernice Taylor. (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload(6:19-bk-15388) [caseupld,1315u] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49257549. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Case Upload) filed by Daniel Lickel of Rooney & Lickel Attorneys at Law on behalf of Alan Curtis Taylor, Sharon Bernice Taylor. (Lickel, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount filed by Daniel Lickel of Rooney & Lickel Attorneys at Law on behalf of Alan Curtis Taylor, Sharon Bernice Taylor. (Lickel, Daniel) WARNING: See docket entries #5, #6, #7, and #8 for corrective actions. Case deficient for Voluntary Petition(missing holographic signatures), due 6/24/19. Statement of Social Security (missing holographic signatures), due 6/24/19. Verification of master mailing list(missing holographic signature), 6/24/19. StmtRelatedCases (LBR F1015-2) , due 7/5/19. Summary(Form 106Sum or 206Sum), due 7/5/19. Schd A/B(Form106A/B or 206A/B), due 7/5/19. Schedule C (Form 106C),due 7/5/19. Schedule D (Form 106D or 206D), due 7/5/19. Schd E/F(Form106E/F or 206E/F), due 7/5/19. Schedule G (Form 106G or 206G), due 7/5/19. Schedule H (Form 106H or 206H), due 7/5/19. Schedule I (Form 106I), due 7/5/19. Schedule J (Form 106J), due 7/5/19. Decl Re Sched (Form 106Dec), due 7/5/19. StmtFinAffairs(Form107 or 207), due 7/5/19. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1), due 7/5/19. Means Calculation(Form 122C-2), due 7/5/19. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1), due 7/5/19. Dcl Db Emp Income(LBR F1002-1), due 7/5/19. Modified on 6/20/2019 (Lozano, Tanisha). (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J Lickel