This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/02/2021 at 06:30:52 (UTC).

Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary F. Walrath. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-10474

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Mary F. Walrath

 

Party Details

Debtor

Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC

3908 Avenue B

Austin, TX 78751

Not Classified By Court

Reliable Companies

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 110

Wilmington, DE 19801

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC

777 Third Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Matthew Barry Lunn

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jared W Kochenash

Attorney at Young Conaway

1000 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Betsy Lee Feldman

Attorney at Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

M. Blake Cleary

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kenneth J. Enos

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Us Trustee Attorney

Timothy Jay Fox, Jr.

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox #35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Bradford J. Sandler

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

919 N. Market Street, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert J. Feinstein

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Avenue, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017-2024

Cia H. Mackle

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Avenue, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Steven W Golden

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Avenue, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

427 #2

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

427 #1

Main Document

417 #2

Certificate of Service

417 #1

Main Document

289 #6

Certificate of Service

289 #5

Exhibit C

289 #4

Exhibit B

289 #3

Exhibit A

289 #2

Notice

289 #1

Main Document

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

630 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#427) Certification of Counsel Regarding Application of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Order, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327, 328, and 1103, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014, and Local Rule 2014-1, Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Effective as of March 16, 2021 (related document(s)#289, #417) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#426) Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (related document(s)#415) Filed by Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/3/2021 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Feldman, Betsy) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#425) Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for an Order Clarifying the Requirements to Provide Access to Confidential or Privileged Information (related document(s)#291) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B - Blackline Order) (Sandler, Bradford) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#424) Notice of Rejection of Lease/Executory Contract // Notice of Rejection of Certain Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property and Abandonment of Property in Connection Therewith (related document(s)#164). Filed by Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kochenash, Jared) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#423) Omnibus Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract // Debtors' Second Omnibus Motion for Order, Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 6006, Authorizing Rejection of Certain Personal Property Leases Filed by Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/15/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice #2 Exhibit A) (Kochenash, Jared) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#422) Exhibit(s) // Notice of Filing of Blackline of Revised Proposed Sale Order (related document(s)#36, #244) Filed by Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Feldman, Betsy) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#421) Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 5, 2021 through April 1, 2021 Filed by Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC. (Kochenash, Jared) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#420) Reply // Debtors' Preliminary Reply to La Cantera Development Company LLC and La Cantera Crossing Retail, LLC's Limited Objection to Debtors' Motion to Approve the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of All Encumbrances (related document(s)#36, #313) Filed by Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC (Cleary, M.) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#419) Limited Objection of Albee Development LLC, Gerrity Group, LLC and UE Yonkers II, LLC to Notice of Possible Assumption and Assignment and Cure Amounts With Respect to Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases of the Debtors and Adequate Assurance Information In Connection With Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (related document(s)#102) Filed by Albee Development LLC, Gerrity Group, LLC, UE Yonkers II LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Roglen, Laurel) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#418) Ombudsman Report for the period of through 04/30/2021 Filed by Luis Salazar. (Salazar, Luis) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
423 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to Continue Customer Programs // Motion of the Debtors for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Honor Prepetition Obligations to Customers and Otherwise Continue Customer Practices, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC (Kochenash, Jared) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims // Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of (A) Critical Vendors and Service Providers and (B) Certain Vendors Entitled to Administrative Expense Priority Under Section 503(b)(9) of the Bankruptcy Code; and (II) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Check and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto Filed By Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC (Kochenash, Jared) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions // Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Payment of Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC (Kochenash, Jared) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions // Debtors' Motion for Order (A) Authorizing Continuation of, and Payment of Prepetition Obligations Incurred in the Ordinary Course of Business in Connection With the Insurance Program, and (B) Authorizing Banks to Honor and Process Checks and Electronic Transfer Requests Related Thereto Filed By Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC (Feldman, Betsy) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service // Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Approving the Debtors Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services, (II) Prohibiting Utility Companies From Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services, (III) Approving the Debtors Proposed Procedures for Resolving Adequate Assurance Requests, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed By Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC (Feldman, Betsy) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent EPIQ CORPORATE RESTRUCTURING, LLC Filed By Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC (Feldman, Betsy) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and Granting Related Relief Filed By Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC (Feldman, Betsy) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketFiled by U.S. Trustee. (Fox, Timothy) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketJudge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LB) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC. (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alamo Drafthouse Cinemas Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Reliable Companies is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant