This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/13/2021 at 06:49:02 (UTC).

Ajit Cab Corp.

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Ajit Cab Corp was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy Hershey Lord. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-40348

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Nancy Hershey Lord

 

Party Details

Debtor

AJIT CAB CORP.

3602-21St Street

Astoria, NY 11106

Us Trustee

Office of the United States Trustee

U.S. Federal Office Building, 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006

New York, NY 10014

Trustee

Nathaniel Wasserstein, Esq.

Upper Nyack, NY 10960

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Karamvir Dahiya

Attorney at Dahiya Law Offices, LLC

75 Maiden Lane, Suite 506

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#26

13 #6

HRG. DISMISS/CONVERT/UST: Notice Recipients

13 #5

HRG. DISMISS/CONVERT/UST

13 #4

Proposed Order

13 #3

Declaration in Support

13 #2

Memorandum of Law

13 #1

Main Document

6 #2

PDF to All Parties, All Credit: Notice Recipients

6 #1

Main Document

#4

Notice of Ch11 Mtg C/P SubCh V: Notice Recipients

4 #3

Notice of Ch11 Mtg C/P SubCh V

4 #2

Notice of Electronic Filing: Notice Recipients

4 #1

Notice of Electronic Filing

#2

Verified Statement of Nathaniel Wasserstein

2 #1

Main Document

3 #2

Def Notice CH11 NonInd 12/1/15: Notice Recipients

3 #1

Def Notice CH11 NonInd 12/1/15

#1

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[RECORD SO ORDERED]; Hearing Held; Appearances: Karamvir Dahiya (Counsel to Debtor), Jeremy Sussman (US Trustee), Nat Wasserstein (Sub Chaptyer V Trustee), Marc Gross & Mark G. Ledwin (Counsel to DePalma Acquisition I, LLC), Tejinder Singh (Debtor's Principal); Hearing Adjourned to 04/27/2021 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY.(related document(s): #13 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Office of the United States Trustee) (AngelaHoward) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[RECORD SO ORDERED]; Hearing Held; Appearances: Karamvir Dahiya (Counsel to Debtor), Jeremy Sussman (US Trustee), Nat Wasserstein (Sub Chaptyer V Trustee), Marc Gross & Mark G. Ledwin (Counsel to DePalma Acquisition I, LLC), Tejinder Singh (Debtor's Principal); Hearing Adjourned to 04/27/2021 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY.(related document(s): #6 Subchapter V Chapter 11 Initial Status Conference Order) (AngelaHoward) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[RECORD SO ORDERED]; Sub V Section 1188 Status Hearing Held; Appearances: Karamvir Dahiya (Counsel to Debtor), Jeremy Sussman (US Trustee), Nat Wasserstein (Sub Chaptyer V Trustee), Marc Gross & Mark G. Ledwin (Counsel to DePalma Acquisition I, LLC), Tejinder Singh (Debtor's Principal); on or before April 16, 2021 all original financials and updated financials must be submitted to the sub v trustee; on or before April 26, 2021, a virtual meeting is to be held between the parties as specified on the record; Hearing Adjourned to 04/27/2021 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY.(related document(s): #6 Subchapter V Chapter 11 Initial Status Conference Order) (AngelaHoward) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Motion for Joint Administration of Case 21-40351 with Case(s) 21-40350, 40351, 40349 Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Ajit Cab Corp.. (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[RECORD SO ORDERED]; Hearing Held; Appearances: Karamvir Dahiya (Counsel to Debtor), Nazar Khodorovsky (US Trustee), Nat Wasserstein (Sub Chaptyer V Trustee), Marc Gross (Counsel to DePalma Acquisition I, LLC); Hearing Adjourned to 04/06/2021 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY.(related document(s): #13 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Office of the United States Trustee) (AngelaHoward) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[RECORD SO ORDERED]; Adjourned Post-Fling Case Conference Hearing Held; Appearances: Karamvir Dahiya (Counsel to Debtor), Nazar Khodorovsky (US Trustee), Nat Wasserstein (Sub Chaptyer V Trustee), Marc Gross (Counsel to DePalma Acquisition I, LLC); on or before midnight on April 5, 2021, counsel to debtor must have provided to the Office of the US Trustee proof of 4 DIP accounts, file retention applications, motions for joint administration to be made and served, file a section 1188 report, proof of insurance provided, proof of a telephonic meeting having been held with the sub v trustee and have provided him with all financial information that had been provided to DePalma; Hearing Adjourned to 04/06/2021 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY.(related document(s): #6 Subchapter V Chapter 11 Initial Status Conference Order) (AngelaHoward) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdjourned Without Hearing (related document(s): #13 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Office of the United States Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdjourned Without Hearing (related document(s): #6 Subchapter V Chapter 11 Initial Status Conference Order) Status hearing to be held on 03/30/2021 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Marc J. Gross on behalf of DePalma Acquisition I, LLC (Gross, Marc) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Affirmation in Opposition Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of Ajit Cab Corp. (RE: related document(s)#13 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee) (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 02/19/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing Notice Date 02/19/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Subchapter V of Chapter 11 Initial Status Conference Setting: (A) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C 105(a), a Post-Filing Conference will be held on 3/2/2021; (B) Claims Bar Date: All creditors other than governmental units shall file proof of their claim or interest not later than seventy (70) days following entry of the order for relief, which in this case is 4/23/2021, and 11 U.S.C. 502(b)(9) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3002(c)(1) shall govern the timing of the filing of proofs of claim by governmental units; (C) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1188 Status Conference to be held on 4/6/2021; and it is further Ordered, that not later than ninety (90) days following entry of the order for relief, or on or before 5/13/2021, the Debtor shall file and serve a plan (11 U.S.C. 1189(b)) and such plan shall conform to the requirements of 11 U.S.C. 1190 and 1191, along with the applicable provisions of 11 U.S.C. 1123 and 1129 and, unless otherwise ordered, the Debtors shall use Official Form 425. Signed on 2/19/2021. Post-Filing Conference scheduled for 3/2/2021 at 10:30 AM (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. Telephonic Status hearing to be held on 4/6/2021 at 10:30 AM (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Pre-Status Report Due By 3/23/2021. Proofs of Claims due by 4/23/2021. (rjl) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Establishing Deadline for filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the form and Manner of Notice thereof. Proofs of Claims due by 4/23/2021. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/11/2021. Signed on 2/19/2021 ( (1) Exhibit) (rjl) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/15/2021 at 12:00 PM at Teleconference - Brooklyn. (tmk) Modified on 2/22/2021 to remove incorrect deadline initially set (tmk). (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Nathaniel Wasserstein, Esq. added to the case. 341 Meeting Date Scheduled for March 15, 2021 at 12:00 PM, at Teleconference Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Nathaniel Wasserstein)(Wolf, Rachel) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketThe above case is related to Case Number(s): 21-40349-nhl Kapur Thala Cab Corp.; 21-40350-nhl Raju Cab Corp.; 21-40351-nhl TS Gill Cab Corp (mem) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 1-21-40348) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A19895671. Fee amount 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Deficient Filing Chapter 11Voluntary Petition [Pages 1-8] due by 2/12/2021. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 2/12/2021.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 2/12/2021. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 2/12/2021. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 2/12/2021. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 2/19/2021. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 2/19/2021. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 2/19/2021. Small Business Tax Return due by 2/19/2021. Subchapter V Balance Sheet due by 2/19/2021. Subchapter V Cash Flow Statement due by 2/19/2021. Small Business Statement of Operations Subchapter V due by 2/19/2021. Subchapter V Tax Return due by 2/19/2021. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor. 11 U.S.C. 329 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2016(b) (Official Form 2030) due 2/26/2021. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 2/26/2021. Schedule A/B due 2/26/2021. Schedule D due 2/26/2021. Schedule E/F due 2/26/2021. Schedule G due 2/26/2021. Schedule H due 2/26/2021. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 2/26/2021. List of Equity Security Holders due 2/26/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 2/26/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 2/26/2021. (tmk) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Small Business Non-Individual Subchapter V. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Karamvir Dahiya on behalf of AJIT CAB CORP. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 05/13/2021. (Dahiya, Karamvir) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less