This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 05:07:24 (UTC).

Aileen Huang

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Aileen Huang was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-BK-18422

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtor

Aileen Huang

San Marino, CA 91108

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Kevin Tang

Attorney at Tang & Associates

18377 Beach Blvd, Suite 211

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/05/2019 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/02/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 09/27/2019. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Aileen Huang. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Aileen Huang. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#1

(#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Aileen Huang (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Aileen Huang. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Property value is listed at an amount LESS THAN the Secured Amount Claimed: 1 included. Filed by Debtor Aileen Huang. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Statistics Reporting*** Motion for Valuation of Security (CM27). (RE: related document(s) #2 ) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:19-bk-18422) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 49422937. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/05/2019 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/02/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 09/27/2019. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Aileen Huang. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Aileen Huang. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Aileen Huang. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Aileen Huang. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1). Property value is listed at an amount LESS THAN the Secured Amount Claimed: 1 included. Filed by Debtor Aileen Huang. (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Aileen Huang (Tang, Kevin) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.