This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/26/2021 at 06:30:46 (UTC).

Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC and Victoria Port Power LLC

Case Summary

On 06/27/2021 Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC and Victoria Port Power LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin Isgur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-BK-32156

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Marvin Isgur

 

Party Details

Debtors

Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC

480 Wildwood Forest Drive, Suite 475

Spring, TX 77380

Victoria Port Power LLC

5850 San Felipe, Ste 601

Houston, TX 77057

Victoria City Power LLC

5850 San Felipe, Ste 601

Houston, TX 77057

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Not Classified By Court

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Elizabeth M Guffy

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

600 Travis, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Eric Wade Boylan

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2800 Travis St, Ste 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Simon Richard Mayer

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

600 Travis, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Joshua W. Wolfshohl

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main, 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Us Trustee Attorneys

Stephen Douglas Statham

Attorney at Office of US Trustee

515 Rusk, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Jana Smith Whitworth

Attorney at Office of United States Trustee

515 Rusk Street, Suite 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Steven William Golden

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Avenue, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Benjamin Lawrence Wallen

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77002

Michael D Warner

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

440 Louisiana Street, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

157 #2

Proposed Order

157 #1

Main Document

#156

155 #3

Exhibit B - Redline

84 #5

Proposed Order

84 #4

Exhibit C

84 #3

Exhibit B

84 #2

Exhibit A

84 #1

Main Document

7 #2

Redline of Prior Proposed Order

#6

5 #2

Proposed Order

5 #1

Main Document

#4

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #1

Main Document

#2

#1

261 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#157) Motion Of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors For An Order Clarifying The Requirements To Provide Access To Confidential Or Privileged Information Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Warner, Michael) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#156) Order Authorizing the Debtors to Employ and Retain Energy Resource Management LLC DBA ERM Capital and Independent Brokerage Solutions LLC as Investment Banker (Related Doc #84) Signed on 8/25/2021. (TylerLaws) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) Certificate of No Objection (Filed By Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC ).(Related document(s):#84 Application to Employ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B - Redline) (Mayer, Simon) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) Certificate of Service (Supplemental) re: Debtors Application for Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention ofEnergy Resource Management LLC dba ERM Capital and Independent BrokerageSolutions LLC as Investment Banker (Docket No. 84) (Filed By Stretto ).(Related document(s):#84 Application to Employ) (Stretto) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#147 Order on Application to Employ) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#146 Order on Application to Employ) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#145 Order on Application to Employ) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#144 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#143 Order on Emergency Motion) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#132 Generic Order) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 08/20/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
144 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order for Joint Administration Signed on 6/28/2021 (Related Doc #5). (TylerLawsadi) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Debtors Master Service List (Filed By Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC ). (Mayer, Simon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Order RE: Amended Proposed Order to Debtors' Emergency Motion for Joint Administration at Docket No. 5 (Filed By Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC ).(Related document(s):#5 Motion for Joint Administration) (Attachments: #1 Redline of Prior Proposed Order) (Mayer, Simon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Joseph G Epstein Filed by on behalf of Castleman Power Development LLC (Epstein, Joseph) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mayer, Simon) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Granting Complex Case Treatment, Signed on 6/28/2021 (Related document(s):#3 Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case) (TylerLaws) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Designation as Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Filed By Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mayer, Simon) (Entered: 06/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007 (Filed By Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC ). (Mayer, Simon) (Entered: 06/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2021
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-32156) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23114609. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Agilon Energy Holdings II LLC. (Guffy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven William Golden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D Warner