This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/20/2022 at 07:00:44 (UTC).

Affordable Housing Foundation Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Affordable Housing Foundation Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Maryland Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy V. Alquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-12693

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Nancy V. Alquist

 

Party Details

Debtor

Affordable Housing Foundation Inc.

1022 Powers Avenue

Cockeysville, MD 21030

Trustee

For Internal Use Only

Us Trustee

US Trustee - Baltimore

101 West Lombard Street, Suite 2625

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Affordable Housing Foundation Inc. . Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 9/16/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/15/2022. (Kaniowski, Amanda) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/15/2022 at 11:00 AM virtually, by ZoomGov or conference call. See the 341 meeting notice for participation information. Proofs of Claims due by 9/13/2022. (Entered: 05/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketChapter 11 filing fee paid. Receipt Number 40143297. Fee Amount $ 1738.00 received by CP. (admin) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Self-Represented Debtors (admin) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/15/2022 at 11:00 AM virtually, by ZoomGov or conference call. See the 341 meeting notice for participation information. Proofs of Claims due by 9/13/2022. (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by Affordable Housing Foundation Inc. . Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 9/16/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/15/2022. (Kaniowski, Amanda) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant