This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/09/2022 at 06:31:05 (UTC).

A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/10/2022 A B C of North Palm Beach, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mindy A Mora. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-BK-12797

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Mindy A Mora

 

Party Details

Debtor

A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.

775 North Lake Blvd.

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Mark S. Roher, Esq.

Attorney at Law Office of Mark S. Roher, P.A.

1806 N. Flamingo Road, Suite 300

Pembroke Pines, FL 33028

Us Trustee Attorney

Heidi A Feinman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Certificate of Service by Attorney Mark S. Roher Esq. (Re: #32 Order on Application to Employ). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

#32

(#32) Order Granting Expedited Application to Employ Jason A. Welt as Real Estate Broker (Re: #21) (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#31

(#31) Certificate of Service by Attorney Mark S. Roher Esq. (Re: #28 Order on Application to Employ, #29 Order on Motion to Approve). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

30 #2

Local Form 4

30 #1

Main Document

#29

(#29) Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part, Debtor's Motion for Authority To Enter into Insurance Premium Finance Agreement Retroactive to April 12, 2022 (Re: #12) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#28

(#28) Order Granting Application to Employ Counsel for Debtor in Possession Effective as of the Petition Date (Re: #3) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#21

(#32) Order Granting Expedited Application to Employ Jason A. Welt as Real Estate Broker (Re: #21) (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

#12

(#29) Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part, Debtor's Motion for Authority To Enter into Insurance Premium Finance Agreement Retroactive to April 12, 2022 (Re: #12) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#9

(#9) Affidavit of Mark S. Roher, Esq. Filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc. (Re: #3 Application to Employ Mark S. Roher, Esq. and The Law Office of Mark S. Roher, P.A. as Counsel for Debtor [NO Affidavit Attached] filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Service by Attorney Mark S. Roher Esq. (Re: #4 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 5/11/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 7/11/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 6/21/2022. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/25/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 4/25/2022. Schedule A/B due 4/25/2022. Schedule D due 4/25/2022. Schedule E/F due 4/25/2022. Schedule G due 4/25/2022. Schedule H due 4/25/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs Due 4/25/2022. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 4/25/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 4/25/2022]. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#4

(#8) Certificate of Service by Attorney Mark S. Roher Esq. (Re: #4 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#28) Order Granting Application to Employ Counsel for Debtor in Possession Effective as of the Petition Date (Re: #3) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.. (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 06/21/2022. (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • Docket(#35) Until Further Notice, the United States Trustee Will Not Appoint a Committee of Creditors Pursuant to 11 USC Section 1102. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docket(#34) Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Feinman, Heidi) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Certificate of Service by Attorney Mark S. Roher Esq. (Re: #32 Order on Application to Employ). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 05/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Order Granting Expedited Application to Employ Jason A. Welt as Real Estate Broker (Re: #21) (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Certificate of Service by Attorney Mark S. Roher Esq. (Re: #28 Order on Application to Employ, #29 Order on Motion to Approve). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule A/B, Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules, List of Equity Security Holders] Filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Local Form 4) (Roher, Mark) Documents Filed Modified on 5/4/2022 (Adam, Lorraine). (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part, Debtor's Motion for Authority To Enter into Insurance Premium Finance Agreement Retroactive to April 12, 2022 (Re: #12) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Order Granting Application to Employ Counsel for Debtor in Possession Effective as of the Petition Date (Re: #3) (Adam, Lorraine) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Mark S. Roher Esq.. (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Certificate of Service by Attorney Mark S. Roher Esq. (Re: #25 Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit of Mark S. Roher, Esq. Filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc. (Re: #3 Application to Employ Mark S. Roher, Esq. and The Law Office of Mark S. Roher, P.A. as Counsel for Debtor [NO Affidavit Attached] filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Service by Attorney Mark S. Roher Esq. (Re: #4 Notice of Hearing by Filer filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.). (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 5/11/2022 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 7/11/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 6/21/2022. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/25/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 4/25/2022. Schedule A/B due 4/25/2022. Schedule D due 4/25/2022. Schedule E/F due 4/25/2022. Schedule G due 4/25/2022. Schedule H due 4/25/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs Due 4/25/2022. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 4/25/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 4/25/2022]. (Ortman, Martha) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Hearing by Filer (Re: #3 Application to Employ Mark S. Roher, Esq. and The Law Office of Mark S. Roher, P.A. as Counsel for Debtor [NO Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.). Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 04/27/2022 at 01:30 PM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom A, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Employ Mark S. Roher, Esq. and The Law Office of Mark S. Roher, P.A. as Counsel for Debtor [NO Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc. (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-12797) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A40728605. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor A.B.C. of North Palm Beach, Inc.. (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 06/21/2022. (Roher, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heidi Ann Feinman(Designation Retained)