This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/26/2022 at 06:30:54 (UTC).

7910 Main Street Property, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 7910 Main Street Property, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott C Clarkson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-BK-10877

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Scott C Clarkson

 

Party Details

Debtor

7910 Main Street Property, LLC

7910 Main Street

Stanton, CA 90680

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Eric Bensamochan

Attorney at The Bensamochan Law Firm, Inc.

9025 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 215

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Us Trustee Attorney

Michael J Hauser

411 W Fourth St Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) Status report Number 1 Updated, Declaration of Michael Woolbright with Proof of Service Thereof Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#26 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

#30

(#30) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#28 Order on Motion For Order Employing Professional (Ch 11)-(LBR 2014-1) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#29

(#29) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#26 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/20/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

#28

(#28) Order Granting Motion In Individual Chapter 11 Case To Authorize Debtor-In-Possession To Employ General Counsel. IT IS ORDERED: The Motion Is GRANTED Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 327 And The Debtor-In-Possession Is Authorized To Employ Eric Bensamochan, Esq. (General Counsel) Effective On 05/27/2022. General Counsel Will Seek Compensation Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 330. In Connection With Any Fee Application, Applicant Is To Submit Full Biographies For All Persons Who Bill The Estate For Incurred Fees And Costs (e.g. Deborah Silver And Paulina Buitron) (LBR 2014-1) (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #12) Signed on 7/19/2022. (NB8) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#27

(#27) Declaration re: Authenticity of the Original Signature Page of the Application to Employ Eric Bensamochan, Esq., as Bankruptcy Counsel with Proof of Service Thereof Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#12 Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Ch 11 Case for Order Employing Professional (LBR 2014-1): Eric Bensamochan as Counsel With Proof of Service Therefore, #26 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#26

(#26) Order Requiring Additional Documents In Connection With The Employment Application And The August 17, 2022, Status Conference. IT IS ORDERED: The Application Does Not Contain The Original Signature Of Mr. Woodbright, Nor Was It Separately Filed, As Required By LBR 9011-1. If The Original Signature Page, Properly Authenticated By A Declartion Establishing That It Was Executed On June 2, 2022, As Indicated In The Application, Is Not Filed By August 3, 2022, The Application Will Be Denied Without Further Notice. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING) (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #22 ) Signed on 7/18/2022 (NB8) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#25

(#25) Errata Notice of Errata with Proof of Service Thereof Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#23 Proof of service). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

#23

(#23) Proof of service Scheduling Order Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) Warning: See docket entry no.: 24 for corrections Modified on 7/11/2022 (GD). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#22

(#22) Status report Number 1 (with Proof of Service Thereof) Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#12

(#27) Declaration re: Authenticity of the Original Signature Page of the Application to Employ Eric Bensamochan, Esq., as Bankruptcy Counsel with Proof of Service Thereof Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#12 Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Ch 11 Case for Order Employing Professional (LBR 2014-1): Eric Bensamochan as Counsel With Proof of Service Therefore, #26 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#9

(#9) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Mulally, Thomas. (Mulally, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Unavailability of Counsel with Proof of Service Thereof Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC. (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/5/2022 at 01:00 PM at UST-SA1, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-919-0527, PARTICIPANT CODE:2240227. (JL) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#5

(#22) Status report Number 1 (with Proof of Service Thereof) Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#4

(#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/29/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/29/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC. (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

1 #2

Ntc of Case Deficient 521

#1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Status report Number 1 Updated, Declaration of Michael Woolbright with Proof of Service Thereof Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#26 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#28 Order on Motion For Order Employing Professional (Ch 11)-(LBR 2014-1) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/21/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#26 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/20/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Order Granting Motion In Individual Chapter 11 Case To Authorize Debtor-In-Possession To Employ General Counsel. IT IS ORDERED: The Motion Is GRANTED Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 327 And The Debtor-In-Possession Is Authorized To Employ Eric Bensamochan, Esq. (General Counsel) Effective On 05/27/2022. General Counsel Will Seek Compensation Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 330. In Connection With Any Fee Application, Applicant Is To Submit Full Biographies For All Persons Who Bill The Estate For Incurred Fees And Costs (e.g. Deborah Silver And Paulina Buitron) (LBR 2014-1) (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #12) Signed on 7/19/2022. (NB8) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Declaration re: Authenticity of the Original Signature Page of the Application to Employ Eric Bensamochan, Esq., as Bankruptcy Counsel with Proof of Service Thereof Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#12 Notice of Motion and Motion in Individual Ch 11 Case for Order Employing Professional (LBR 2014-1): Eric Bensamochan as Counsel With Proof of Service Therefore, #26 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Order Requiring Additional Documents In Connection With The Employment Application And The August 17, 2022, Status Conference. IT IS ORDERED: The Application Does Not Contain The Original Signature Of Mr. Woodbright, Nor Was It Separately Filed, As Required By LBR 9011-1. If The Original Signature Page, Properly Authenticated By A Declartion Establishing That It Was Executed On June 2, 2022, As Indicated In The Application, Is Not Filed By August 3, 2022, The Application Will Be Denied Without Further Notice. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING) (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #22 ) Signed on 7/18/2022 (NB8) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Errata Notice of Errata with Proof of Service Thereof Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#23 Proof of service). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect Case Number Format. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF ERRATA WITH THE PROPER CASE NUMBER FORMAT. YOU HAVE THE WRONG DIVISION NUMBER ON THIS DOCUMENT - YOU HAVE DIVISION "2" - SHOULD BE DIVISION "8" - PLEASE CORRECT ASAP - THANK YOU FOR YOUR ATTENTION TO THIS MATTER. (RE: related document(s)#23 Proof of service filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC) (GD) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Proof of service Scheduling Order Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) Warning: See docket entry no.: 24 for corrections Modified on 7/11/2022 (GD). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Status report Number 1 (with Proof of Service Thereof) Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC (RE: related document(s)#5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)). (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Mulally, Thomas. (Mulally, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Unavailability of Counsel with Proof of Service Thereof Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC. (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/5/2022 at 01:00 PM at UST-SA1, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-919-0527, PARTICIPANT CODE:2240227. (JL) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Hearing Set (RE: related document #5 Order (1) Setting Scheduling Hearing And Case Management Conference And (2) Requiring Status Report.) Status Conference hearing to be held on 7/27/2022 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5C - Virtual - (Accessibility information will be posted into the Court's tentative ruling prior to the hearing), 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order (1) Setting Scheduling Hearing And Case Management Conference And (2) Requiring Status Report. The Status Conference hearing is set for July 27, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5C - Virtual (Accessibility information will be posted into the Court's tentative ruling prior to the hearing), located at 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 5/31/2022 (NB8) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/29/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules/statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC) (TS) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 8:22-bk-10877) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A54284625. Fee amount 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor 7910 Main Street Property, LLC. (Bensamochan, Eric) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by 7910 Main Street Property, LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 06/10/2022. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 06/10/2022. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 06/10/2022. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 06/10/2022. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 06/10/2022. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 06/10/2022. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 06/10/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 06/10/2022. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 06/10/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 06/10/2022. (Bensamochan, Eric) WARNING: See docket entry #3 for correction. Deadlines Terminated: Schedule C, Declaration Debtor Empl Income. Modified on 5/27/2022 (TS). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Hauser