This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/19/2022 at 06:31:58 (UTC).

6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert A Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-10385

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Robert A Mark

 

Party Details

Debtor

6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC

300 Ne 71St Street

Miami, FL 33138

Us Trustee

Office of the US Trustee

51 S.W. 1St Ave., Suite 1204

Miami, FL 33130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Geoffrey S. Aaronson

2 South Biscayne Blvd., 34Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Tamara D McKeown

One Biscayne Tower, Suite 3450, 2 South Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

Steven L Beiley, Esq.

Attorney at Aaronson Schantz Beiley P.A.

2 S Biscayne Blvd 34 Fl

Miami, FL 33131

Us Trustee Attorney

Steven D Schneiderman

Attorney at Office of the US Trustee

51 Sw 1 Ave #1204

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

#83

(#83) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10388 Filed by Interested Party 5900 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#82

(#82) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10391 Filed by Interested Party 175 NE 55th Street, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#81

(#81) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10392 Filed by Interested Party 5524 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#80

(#80) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10390 Filed by Interested Party 5700 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#79

(#79) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10387 Filed by Interested Party 5901 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#78

(#78) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10386 Filed by Interested Party 5911 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

77 #3

Bank Statement

77 #2

P&L Statement

77 #1

Main Document

#8

(#8) Certificate of Service by Attorney Steven L Beiley Esq. (Re: #4 Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 22-10386, 22-10387, 22-10388, 22-10390, 22-10391, 22-10392 into Lead Case 22-10385 filed by Debtor 6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, #5 Order on Motion For Joint Administration). (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Kenneth D Murena Filed by Creditor Chemtov Mortgage Group Corp.. (Murena, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 2/23/2022 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 4/25/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 3/29/2022. (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#5

(#8) Certificate of Service by Attorney Steven L Beiley Esq. (Re: #4 Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 22-10386, 22-10387, 22-10388, 22-10390, 22-10391, 22-10392 into Lead Case 22-10385 filed by Debtor 6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, #5 Order on Motion For Joint Administration). (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Main Document

#3

(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #3 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts .) Notice Date 01/21/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/22/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 1/26/2022]. List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Due: 1/26/2022.Corporate Ownership Statement due 1/26/2022. List of Equity Security Holders due 2/1/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/1/2022. Schedule A/B due 2/1/2022. Schedule D due 2/1/2022. Schedule E/F due 2/1/2022. Schedule G due 2/1/2022. Schedule H due 2/1/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 2/1/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 2/1/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 2/1/2022]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 03/29/2022. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

112 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10388 Filed by Interested Party 5900 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10391 Filed by Interested Party 175 NE 55th Street, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10392 Filed by Interested Party 5524 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10390 Filed by Interested Party 5700 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10387 Filed by Interested Party 5901 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 for Member Case Number 22-10386 Filed by Interested Party 5911 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Period Ending 2/28/2022 Filed by Debtor 6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC. (Attachments: #1 P&L Statement #2 Bank Statement) (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Transcript of 1/28/2022 Hearing. [Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days.] (Re: #13 Expedited Motion to Use Cash Collateral , in addition to Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Interested Parties 175 NE 55th Street, LLC, 5524 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5700 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5900 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5901 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5911 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, Debtor 6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order), #15 Motion to Consolidate Case(s) 22-10386, 22-10387, 22-10388, 22-10390, 22-10391, 22-10392 into Lead Case 22-10385 Filed by Interested Parties 175 NE 55th Street, LLC, 5524 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5700 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5900 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5901 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5911 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, Debtor 6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC). Redaction Request Due By 03/21/2022. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Due by 04/12/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/10/2022. (Ouellette and Mauldin) (Entered: 03/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Notice of Filing of Amended Budget Through July 31, 2022, Filed by Interested Parties 175 NE 55th Street, LLC, 5524 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5700 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5900 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5901 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, 5911 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, Debtor 6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC (Re: #73 Order on Motion To Reconsider). (Aaronson, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Certificate of Service by Attorney Geoffrey S. Aaronson (Re: #73 Order on Motion To Reconsider). (Aaronson, Geoffrey) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing (Re: #3 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts .) Notice Date 01/21/2022. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Service by Attorney Steven L Beiley Esq. (Re: #4 Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 22-10386, 22-10387, 22-10388, 22-10390, 22-10391, 22-10392 into Lead Case 22-10385 filed by Debtor 6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC, #5 Order on Motion For Joint Administration). (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Kenneth D Murena Filed by Creditor Chemtov Mortgage Group Corp.. (Murena, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 2/23/2022 at 12:00 PM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 4/25/2022. Proofs of Claim due by 3/29/2022. (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration of Cases 22-10386-RAM 22-10387-RAM, 22-10388-RAM, 22-10390-RAM, 22-10391-RAM, 22-10392-RAM into LEAD Case 22-10385-RAM (Re: #4) (Cohen, Diana) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Ex Parte Motion to Jointly Administer Case(s) 22-10386, 22-10387, 22-10388, 22-10390, 22-10391, 22-10392 into Lead Case 22-10385 Filed by Debtor 6200 NE 2nd Avenue, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McKeown, Tamara) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 1/26/2022]. List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Due: 1/26/2022.Corporate Ownership Statement due 1/26/2022. List of Equity Security Holders due 2/1/2022. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/1/2022. Schedule A/B due 2/1/2022. Schedule D due 2/1/2022. Schedule E/F due 2/1/2022. Schedule G due 2/1/2022. Schedule H due 2/1/2022.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 2/1/2022.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 2/1/2022. [Incomplete Filings due by 2/1/2022]. (Skinner-Grant, Sheila) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(22-10385) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40332958. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 03/29/2022. (Beiley, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven D. Schneiderman(Designation Retained)