This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 05/13/2022 at 07:01:56 (UTC).

560 55 Street, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 560 55 Street, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New Jersey Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Stacey L. Meisel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-BK-13898

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Stacey L. Meisel

 

Party Details

Debtor

560 55 Street, LLC

1500 W. Blancke Street

Linden, NJ 07036

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

One Newark Center Ste 2100

Newark, NJ 07102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Stephen B. McNally

Attorney at McNally & Busche, L.L.C.

93 Main Street, Suite 201

Newton, NJ 07860

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Stephen B. McNally on behalf of 560 55 Street, LLC. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 11/8/2022. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 03/8/2023. (McNally, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 7/21/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/8/2022. (dmc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/15/2022 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 7/21/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/8/2022. (dmc) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-13898) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43888485, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Stephen B. McNally on behalf of 560 55 Street, LLC. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 11/8/2022. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 03/8/2023. (McNally, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen McNally