This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 04/01/2021 at 06:39:18 (UTC).

5 Bryant Park NYC LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2021 5 Bryant Park NYC LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Delaware Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary F. Walrath. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-BK-10226

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Mary F. Walrath

 

Party Details

Debtor

5 Bryant Park NYC LLC

5-9 Union Square West

New York, NY 10003

Not Classified By Court

Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.

5955 Desoto Avenue, Suite #100

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building, 844 King Street, Suite 2207, Lockbox 35

Wilmington, DE 19801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Matthew B. Harvey

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell, LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899-1347

Robert J. Dehney

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell

1201 N. Market Street, P O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899-1347

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Main Document

#2

Proposed Form of Order

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Statements Filed by 5 Bryant Park NYC LLC. (Harvey, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Schedules Filed by 5 Bryant Park NYC LLC. (Harvey, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Knotel, Inc. and its affiliated debtors. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Knotel, Inc., Case No. 21-10146 (MFW), should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 2/2/2021 (LMC) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by 350 Sansome St SF LLC, 3535 Hayden Ave LA LLC, 360 Madison NYC LLC, 369 Lexington Ave NYC LLC, 390 Broadway NYC LLC, 40 Broad St BOS LLC, 400 Sutter St SF LLC, 405 E 4th Avenue SM LLC, 405 Howard Street SF LLC, 429 Santa Monica Blvd LA LLC, 42Floors, LLC, 44 E 32nd Street NYC LLC, 44 Thomson Pl BOS LLC, 447 Broadway NYC LLC, 45 W 45 ST NYC LLC, 4501 Glencoe Blvd LA LLC, 455 Market St SF LLC, 456 Montgomery St SF LLC, 465 California St SF LLC, 5 Bryant Park NYC LLC. (Dehney, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketJudge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LB) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Receipt Number 93151, Fee Amount $1738. Filed by 5 Bryant Park NYC LLC . (Harvey, Matthew) Modified on 2/3/2021 (COH). (Entered: 01/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B. Harvey(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Dehney