This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 12/18/2021 at 18:36:54 (UTC).

2999TC Acquisitions, LLC v. HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2021 2999TC Acquisitions, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Northern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Harlin DeWayne Hale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-AP-03085

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Harlin DeWayne Hale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2999TC Acquisitions, LLC

13901 Midway Rd.Suite 102

Dallas, TX 75244

Defendants

HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC

Vipin Nambiar

HN Green Hollow Capital Partners, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joyce W. Lindauer

Attorney at Joyce W. Lindauer Attorney, PLLC

1412 Main Streetsuite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorney

Russell Hale Neilson

Attorney at Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC

901 Main Street, Suite 5200

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#12 Order granting motion to abate deadlines though and including March 15, 2022.(related document #11) Entered on 12/10/2021.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/12/2021. (Admin.)

#12

(#12) Order granting motion to abate deadlines though and including March 15, 2022.(related document #11) Entered on 12/10/2021. (Okafor, Marcey)

11 #2

Agreed Proposed Order

11 #1

Main Document

10 #5

Proposed Order

10 #4

Exhibit Forbearance Agreement

10 #3

Exhibit Federal Case Agreed Judgment

10 #2

Exhibit Federal Case Amended Complaint

10 #1

Main Document

9 #5

Proposed Order

9 #4

Exhibit Forbearance Agreement

9 #3

Exhibit Federal Case Agreed Judgment

9 #2

Exhibit Federal Case Amended Complaint

9 #1

Main Document

8 #5

Proposed Order

8 #4

Exhibit Forbearance Agreement

8 #2

Exhibit Federal Case Amended Complaint

8 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#12 Order granting motion to abate deadlines though and including March 15, 2022.(related document #11) Entered on 12/10/2021.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/12/2021. (Admin.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order granting motion to abate deadlines though and including March 15, 2022.(related document #11) Entered on 12/10/2021. (Okafor, Marcey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion to abate (Agreed Motion to Abate Deadlines) (related document(s)#10 Motion to dismiss HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC) filed by Defendant HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC (Attachments: #1 Agreed Proposed Order) (Neilson, Russell)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to dismiss HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC filed by Defendant HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Case Amended Complaint #2 Exhibit Federal Case Agreed Judgment #3 Exhibit Forbearance Agreement #4 Proposed Order) (Ward, J) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Motion for sanctions Other Rule 9011 against 2999TC Acquisitions, LLC filed by Defendant HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Case Amended Complaint #2 Exhibit Federal Case Agreed Judgment #3 Exhibit Forbearance Agreement #4 Proposed Order) (Neilson, Russell)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET ERROR: INCORRECT EVENT. SEE ENTRY #10. Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Case Amended Complaint #2 Exhibit Federal Case Agreed Judgment #3 Exhibit Forbearance Agreement #4 Proposed Order) (Neilson, Russell) Modified on 12/9/2021 (Ward, J).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons service executed on HN Green Hollow Capital Partners, LLC 11/18/2021 (Lindauer, Joyce)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons service executed on Vipin Nambiar 11/18/2021 (Lindauer, Joyce)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons service executed on HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC 11/18/2021 (Lindauer, Joyce)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 2999TC Acquisitions, LLC). Trial Docket Call date set for 3/28/2022 at 10:30 AM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/hale. Trial to be set the week of 4/4/2022. Entered on 11/15/2021 (Bergreen, J.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons issued on HN Green Hollow Capital Partners, LLC Answer Due 12/15/2021; HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC Answer Due 12/15/2021; Vipin Nambiar Answer Due 12/15/2021 (Bergreen, J.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Adversary proceeding cover sheet filed by Plaintiff 2999TC Acquisitions, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint). (Lindauer, Joyce)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Complaint(# 21-03085-hdh) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A29122227, amount $ 350.00 (re: Doc#1). (U.S. Treasury)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 21-03085. Complaint by 2999TC Acquisitions, LLC against HNGH Turtle Creek, LLC, Vipin Nambiar, HN Green Hollow Capital Partners, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer). 14 (Recovery of money/property - other). (Lindauer, Joyce)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Hale Neilson