This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/05/2021 at 06:05:09 (UTC).

231 E 123 LLC

Case Summary

On 05/23/2021 231 E 123 LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric L. Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-BK-11469

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Eric L. Frank

 

Party Details

Debtor

231 E 123 LLC

231 E 123Rd Street

New York, NY 10035

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

200 Chestnut Street, Suite 502

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

EDMOND M. GEORGE

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel, LLP

1500 Market Street, Suite 3400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

MICHAEL D. VAGNONI

Attorney at Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP

1500 Market Street, Suite 3400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Us Trustee Attorney

DAVE P. ADAMS

Attorney at United States Trustee

200 Chestnut Street, Suite 502

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

#56

(#56) Fee due notice in re: Amended Schedule E/F. (related document(s)#52). (S., Antoinette) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

55 #2

Verification

55 #1

Main Document

#54

(#54) Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors for Amended Schedule E/F and Amended Schedule G Filed by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of 231 E 123 LLC. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#53

(#53) Amended Schedule G - Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of 231 E 123 LLC. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#52

(#52) Amended Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Fee Amount $32 Filed by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of 231 E 123 LLC. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#51

(#51) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #50)). No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 07/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/05/2021)

#50

(#50) Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered consolidating this Chapter 11 case for procedural purposes only, and providing for its joint administration with the Chapter 11 case of 1121 Pier Village LLC, case no. 21-11466-ELF. It is Ordered that all original docket entries shall be made on the docket of 1121 Pier Village LLC at case no. 21-11466-ELF. (B., John) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#49

(#49) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by LAUREN S. ZABEL Filed by LAUREN S. ZABEL on behalf of Sharestates Intercap Line LLC, Sharestates Investments LLC. (ZABEL, LAUREN) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice of (related document(s): #6 Motion for Joint Administration ) Filed by 231 E 123 LLC. Hearing scheduled 6/23/2021 at 11:00 AM at nix1 - courtroom #1. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

6 #3

Certificate of Service

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Order Scheduling Status Hearing. Hearing scheduled 5/26/2021 at 11:00 AM at nix1 - courtroom #1. (R., Sara) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by DAVE P. ADAMS Filed by DAVE P. ADAMS on behalf of United States Trustee. (ADAMS, DAVE) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#3

(#3) Order Entered the debtor having failed to file or submit with the petition all of the documents required by Fed. R. Bankr.P.1007, It is hereby ORDERED that this case MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE if the documents listed are not filed by deadlines listed: Any request for an extension of time must be filed prior to the expiration of the deadlines listed. (Statement of Corporate Ownership due 06/7/2021. Matrix List of Creditors due 06/1/2021. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 06/7/2021. Atty Disclosure Statement due 06/7/2021. List of Equity Security Holders due 06/7/2021. Schedule A/B due 06/7/2021. Schedule D due 06/7/2021. Schedule E/F due 06/7/2021. Schedule G due 06/7/2021. Schedule H due 06/7/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/7/2021. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities Form B206 due 06/7/2021.) (R., Sara) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Resolution Filed by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of 231 E 123 LLC. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 05/23/2021)

#1

Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11469) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23343010. Fee Amount $1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/23/2021)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Schedule E/F - (for first filing and amendments)(# 21-11469-elf) [misc,schef] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23468630. Fee Amount $ 32.00. (re: Doc#52) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Fee due notice in re: Amended Schedule E/F. (related document(s)#52). (S., Antoinette) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee not applicable. Only one fee of $32.00 when both amended schedules and matrix are filed on the same day. (re: Doc#55) (S.) Modified on 7/15/2021 (S., Antoinette). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Amendment to Matrix List of Creditors. Fee Amount $32 Number of Pages Filed: 2, Filed by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of 231 E 123 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification) (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors for Amended Schedule E/F and Amended Schedule G Filed by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of 231 E 123 LLC. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Amended Schedule G - Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Filed by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of 231 E 123 LLC. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Amended Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Fee Amount $32 Filed by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of 231 E 123 LLC. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #50)). No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 07/04/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered consolidating this Chapter 11 case for procedural purposes only, and providing for its joint administration with the Chapter 11 case of 1121 Pier Village LLC, case no. 21-11466-ELF. It is Ordered that all original docket entries shall be made on the docket of 1121 Pier Village LLC at case no. 21-11466-ELF. (B., John) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by LAUREN S. ZABEL Filed by LAUREN S. ZABEL on behalf of Sharestates Intercap Line LLC, Sharestates Investments LLC. (ZABEL, LAUREN) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of (related document(s): #8 Application to Employ Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP as Counsel to Debtors ) Filed by 231 E 123 LLC. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application to Employ Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP as Counsel to Debtors Filed by 231 E 123 LLC Represented by EDMOND M. GEORGE (Counsel). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Disinterestedness #2 Proposed Order #3 Certificate of Service) (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of (related document(s): #6 Motion for Joint Administration ) Filed by 231 E 123 LLC. Hearing scheduled 6/23/2021 at 11:00 AM at nix1 - courtroom #1. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for Joint Administration Filed by 231 E 123 LLC Represented by EDMOND M. GEORGE (Counsel). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certificate of Service) (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Scheduling Status Hearing. Hearing scheduled 5/26/2021 at 11:00 AM at nix1 - courtroom #1. (R., Sara) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by DAVE P. ADAMS Filed by DAVE P. ADAMS on behalf of United States Trustee. (ADAMS, DAVE) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Entered the debtor having failed to file or submit with the petition all of the documents required by Fed. R. Bankr.P.1007, It is hereby ORDERED that this case MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE if the documents listed are not filed by deadlines listed: Any request for an extension of time must be filed prior to the expiration of the deadlines listed. (Statement of Corporate Ownership due 06/7/2021. Matrix List of Creditors due 06/1/2021. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 06/7/2021. Atty Disclosure Statement due 06/7/2021. List of Equity Security Holders due 06/7/2021. Schedule A/B due 06/7/2021. Schedule D due 06/7/2021. Schedule E/F due 06/7/2021. Schedule G due 06/7/2021. Schedule H due 06/7/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/7/2021. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities Form B206 due 06/7/2021.) (R., Sara) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 21-11469) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23343010. Fee Amount $1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Resolution Filed by EDMOND M. GEORGE on behalf of 231 E 123 LLC. (GEORGE, EDMOND) (Entered: 05/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by 231 E 123 LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/20/2021. Statement of Corporate Ownership due 06/7/2021. Matrix List of Creditors due 06/1/2021. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 06/7/2021. Atty Disclosure Statement due 06/7/2021. List of Equity Security Holders due 06/7/2021. Schedule A/B due 06/7/2021. Schedule D due 06/7/2021. Schedule E/F due 06/7/2021. Schedule G due 06/7/2021. Schedule H due 06/7/2021. Statement of Financial Affairs due 06/7/2021. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities Form B206 due 06/7/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 06/7/2021. (GEORGE, EDMOND) Modified on 5/25/2021 to remove docs not due (W., Belinda). (Entered: 05/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVE ADAMS(Designation Retained)